EP2599765 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALDEHYDES OR KETONES BY OXIDIZING ALCOHOLS WITH OXYGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states East China Normal University 3663 North Zhongshan Road Putuo District, Shanghai 200062 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Institute of Organic Chemistry, Chinese Academy of Sciences 345 Ling Ling Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | [2015/46] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states East China Normal University 3663 North Zhongshan Road Putuo District, Shanghai 200062 / CN | ||
For all designated states Shanghai Institute Of Organic Chemistry, Chinese Academy Of Sciences 345 Fenglin Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Shengming No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jinxian No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 03 /
LI, Suhua No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Bo No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 05 /
CHENG, Jiajia No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 06 /
KUANG, Jinqiang No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Yu No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 08 /
WAN, Baoqiang No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Yuli No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 10 /
YE, Juntao No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 11 /
YU, Qiong No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 12 /
YUAN, Weiming No.3663 North Zhongshan Rd. Putuo District Shanghai 200062 / CN | 13 /
YU, Shichao No.345 Lingling Rd. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/09] |
Former [2013/23] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10855180.5 | 30.07.2010 | [2016/09] | WO2010CN75608 | Priority number, date | CN201010237170 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: CN201010237170 | [2013/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012012952 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599765 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599765 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/37, C07C45/38, C07C45/39, C07C45/29, B01J31/02, B01J31/26, C07C47/00, C07C49/00 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
C07C45/38 (EP,US);
B01J31/006 (EP,US);
B01J31/28 (EP,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C45/39 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
B01J2231/763 (EP,US);
B01J2531/842 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/44 (US,EP);
C07C45/38, C07C47/02 (EP,US);
C07C45/38, C07C47/21 (US,EP);
C07C45/38, C07C47/222 (EP,US);
C07C45/38, C07C47/232 (US,EP);
C07C45/38, C07C47/277 (EP,US);
C07C45/38, C07C47/55 (US,EP);
C07C45/38, C07C47/575 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/04 (EP,US);
C07C45/39, C07C49/203 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/207 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/217 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/235 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/403 (EP,US);
C07C45/39, C07C49/683 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/78 (EP,US);
C07C45/39, C07C49/794 (US,EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/80 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALDEHYDEN ODER KETONEN DURCH OXIDIERUNG VON ALKOHOLEN MIT SAUERSTOFF | [2013/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALDEHYDES OR KETONES BY OXIDIZING ALCOHOLS WITH OXYGEN | [2013/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ALDÉHYDES OU DE CÉTONES PAR OXYDATION D'ALCOOLS AVEC DE L'OXYGÈNE | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2012 | Translation filed | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 26.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2010 | AL | 02.03.2016 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | IE | 30.07.2016 | LU | 30.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101709026 (VITAMIN FACTORY ZHEJIANG MEDIC) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2007078284 (TANIELYAN SETRAK K [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CN101565344 (DALIAN INST CHEM & PHYSICS [CN]); | [Y]US2007078284 (TANIELYAN SETRAK K [US], et al); | [Y]CN101544548 (DALIAN CHEMICAL PHYSICS INST) | by applicant | - KOTEEL, C., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1977), vol. 99, pages 3837 - 3838 | - GRIFFITH, W. P., CHEM. SOC. REV., (1992), vol. 21, pages 179 - 185 | - BLACKBURN, T. F.; SCHWARTZ, J. J., CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1977), pages 157 - 158 | - PIERA, J.; BÄCKVALL, J.-E., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2008), vol. 47, page 3506 | - SHELDON, R. A.; ARENDS, . W. C. E.; BRINK, G.-J. T; DIJKSMAN, A., ACC. CHEM. RES., (2002), vol. 35, page 774 | - MALLAT, T; BAIKER, A., CHEM. REV., (2004), vol. 104, page 3037 |