EP2617275 - FAN UNIT AND ITS MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALGAARD, Sven Erik Wagnersvej 220 DK-7500 Holstebro / DK | 02 /
KNUTSSON, Hans Pilgårdvej 32 DK-7620 Lemvig / DK | 03 /
PASGAARD, Thorbjörn Nörgårdvej 41 DK-7600 Struer / DK | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Aros Patent AB Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [2014/46] |
Former [2013/30] | Fredriksson, Teresia, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 10857347.8 | 17.09.2010 | WO2010SE50999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012036604 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617275 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/16, H05K7/20, F04D29/60, G06F1/20, F04D29/58 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
F04D25/166 (EP,US);
F04D29/58 (US);
F04D29/601 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (EP,US);
H05K7/20581 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H05K7/20, F04D29/64, H05K1/18, F04D25/16, G06F1/20, H05K5/02, H05K7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | VENTILATOREINHEIT UND IHRE MONTAGE | [2013/30] | English: | FAN UNIT AND ITS MOUNTING | [2013/30] | French: | UNITÉ DE VENTILATEUR ET SON MONTAGE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 29.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6638016 (MEASE KEITH D [US], et al); | [A]US2006120040 (CHEN FENG-MING [TW]); | [A]US2008014093 (FAN CHEN-LU [TW], et al) |