Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
16.09.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.09.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.11.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
28.09.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
28.06.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
21.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.09.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.04.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |