EP2567066 - GAS HYDRATE CONVERSION SYSTEM FOR HARVESTING HYDROCARBON HYDRATE DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAlister Technologies, LLC 2901 E. Camelback Road Phoenix, AZ 85016 / US | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states McAlister Technologies, LLC 2350 W Shangri La Phoenix, AZ 85029 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCALISTER, Roy, E. 2350 W Shangri La Phoenix AZ 85029 / US | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10858212.3 | 16.08.2010 | WO2010US45629 | Priority number, date | US20090237476P | 27.08.2009 Original published format: US 237476 P | WO2010US24499 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: PCT/US2010/024499 | US20100707656 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: US 707656 | WO2010US24498 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: PCT/US2010/024498 | US20100707653 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: US 707653 | WO2010US24497 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: PCT/US2010/024497 | US20100707651 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: US 707651 | US20100304403P | 13.02.2010 Original published format: US 304403 P | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012047187 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2567066 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/22, E21B43/25 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F03G7/04 (KR);
C01B3/22 (EP);
C01B3/34 (EP);
C01B32/225 (EP);
C10L3/108 (EP);
C25B1/00 (EP);
C25B1/02 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B1/26 (EP);
C25B11/03 (EP);
C25B13/02 (EP);
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
C25B3/00 (EP);
C25B9/17 (EP);
E21C50/00 (EP);
F02G5/04 (EP);
F03B13/1885 (EP);
F03G3/08 (KR);
F03G7/05 (EP);
F22B33/18 (KR);
F24D11/005 (EP);
F24H8/00 (KR);
F24S10/40 (EP);
F24S20/20 (EP);
F24S23/30 (EP);
H01M8/0656 (EP);
H01M8/186 (EP);
C01B2203/0216 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/043 (EP);
C01B2203/061 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP);
C01B2203/84 (EP);
C02F1/46104 (EP);
C02F2303/10 (EP);
F24D2200/26 (EP);
F24D2200/29 (EP);
F24D2200/30 (EP);
F24S23/71 (EP,US);
F28D7/103 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B30/52 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP);
Y02E10/46 (EP);
Y02E20/14 (EP);
Y02E60/16 (KR);
Y02E60/36 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP);
Y02P20/129 (EP);
Y02P20/133 (EP);
Y02P20/20 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02P80/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02W10/30 (EP);
Y02W10/33 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Title | German: | GASHYDRATUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DEN ABBAU VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFHYDRATLAGERN | [2013/11] | English: | GAS HYDRATE CONVERSION SYSTEM FOR HARVESTING HYDROCARBON HYDRATE DEPOSITS | [2013/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONVERSION D'HYDRATE DE GAZ POUR LA RÉCOLTE DE DÉPÔTS D'HYDRATE D'HYDROCARBURE | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/39] | 28.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 28.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 28.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2012 | 31.08.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9423993 (WIDENHAMMAR RUSTAN [SE], et al); | [X]US5950732 (AGEE MARK A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004118447 (MUHS JEFFREY D [US], et al); | [A]US2005072301 (BACIU PETRU [US]); | [A]US2005092482 (WENDLAND CHARLES [US]) |