EP2646717 - METHOD OF JOINING A CERAMIC PLUG TIP AND A STEEL SUPPORT MEMBER USING A THREADED JOINT AND AN ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Process Management (Tianjin) Valve Co., Ltd. No. 15 Xing Wang Road Wuqing Development Area Tianjin 301700 / CN | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Chun Hao Da Apartment 7-2-301 Hong Qiao District Tianjin 300134 / CN | 02 /
YU, Zhongwei Qi Shui Yuan 4-4-302 Hong Qiao District Tianjin 300131 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhengyu BLC Unit 3 Building 2 Qing Bo Yuan Lan Dian Chang Hai Dian District Beijing 100097 / CN | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Leske, Thomas Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2013/41] | Leske, Thomas Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10860311.9 | 01.12.2010 | [2016/37] | WO2010CN79341 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012071723 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646717 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646717 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/38 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
F16K25/005 (EP,US);
B29C65/72 (NO,US);
F16K1/38 (EP,NO,US);
F16K1/48 (EP,NO,US);
Y10T137/6065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINER KERAMISCHEN STECKERSPITZE UND EINES STAHLTRÄGERELEMENTS MIT EINER GEWINDEVERBINDUNG UND KLEBSTOFF | [2013/41] | English: | METHOD OF JOINING A CERAMIC PLUG TIP AND A STEEL SUPPORT MEMBER USING A THREADED JOINT AND AN ADHESIVE | [2013/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE JONCTION D'UNE POINTE D'OPERCULE CÉRAMIQUE ET D'UN ÉLÉMENT SUPPORT EN ACIER UTILISANT UN JOINT FILETÉ ET UN ADHÉSIF | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 14.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 01.12.2016 | LU | 01.12.2016 | MT | 01.12.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.12.2016 | ||
LU | 01.12.2016 | ||
MT | 01.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.12.2016 | ||
LU | 01.12.2016 | ||
MT | 01.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.12.2016 | ||
LU | 01.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.12.2016 | ||
LU | 01.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.12.2016 | ||
LU | 01.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3572633 (GAFFNEY DONALD J) [A] 1,11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010140530 (ROBISON JEFFREY C [US]) [A] 1,11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1288028 (VENJUKOVSKY) [A] 1,11,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1606671 (FISHER CONTROLS INT [US]); | [A]US3472481 (SPIES GEORGE R JR); | [A]US6820857 (LANCASTER MICHAEL F [US]); | [A]JPH0886376 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]US3211164 (ALFRED BENDER, et al) | Examination | US4575047 |