EP2649799 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A MOTION VECTOR FOR A CURRENT BLOCK OF A CURRENT VIDEO FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3, Rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing DTV 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Xiaodong 907, Bld. 4 Fortune Building No.9 Da Liu Shu Rd. Hai Dian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Debing 701, Bld.3 Xue Zhi Yuan No.16 Xue Qing Rd. Hai Dian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhibo Room 1613 Yue Hua Xuan Bei Tai Ping Zhuang Rd. Hai Dian District Beijing 100088 / CN | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Rolland, Sophie, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Labelle, Lilian, et al Technicolor R&D France 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 10860415.8 | 10.12.2010 | WO2010CN02011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012075612 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2649799 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/61, H04N19/513, H04N19/57, H04N17/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/521 (EP,US);
H04N19/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES BEWEGUNGSVEKTORS FÜR EINEN AKTUELLEN BLOCK EINES AKTUELLEN VIDEOBILDES | [2013/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A MOTION VECTOR FOR A CURRENT BLOCK OF A CURRENT VIDEO FRAME | [2013/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UN VECTEUR DE MOUVEMENT POUR UN BLOC COURANT D'UNE TRAME VIDÉO COURANTE | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 18.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1503599 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] *; | [IA] - JONG OK LEE ET AL, "An Efficient Frame Rate Up-Conversion Method for Mobile Phone with Projection Functionality", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20071101), vol. 53, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TCE.2007.4429260, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 1615 - 1621, XP011199940 [I] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs II.A - II.B with figures 3 and 4 * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2007.4429260 | [A] - SHEN-CHUAN TAI ET AL, "A Multi-Pass True Motion Estimation Scheme With Motion Vector Propagation for Frame Rate Up-Conversion Applications", JOURNAL OF DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080601), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JDT.2007.916014, ISSN 1551-319X, pages 188 - 197, XP011334388 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 194, column l, line 4 - line l * * section II. with figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JDT.2007.916014 | [A] - JOONYOUNG CHANG ET AL, "Adaptive Arbitration of Intra-Field and Motion Compensation Methods for De-Interlacing", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090801), vol. 19, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2020341, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1214 - 1220, XP011268160 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1216, column r, paragraph l - page 1217, column l, paragraph 1; figure 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2020341 | [A] - LIU M ET AL, "Multiframe super-resolution based on block motion vector processing and kernel constrained convex set projection", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2009 - 22-1-2009; SAN JOSE,, (20090120), XP030081763 [A] 1-10 * section 3 with figures 1 and 2 * | International search | [A]CN101009831 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN101006729 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO2010122301 (IMAGINATION TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2010309979 (SCHOENBLUM JOEL W [US]); | [A]CN101179731 (TANDBERG TELEVISION ASA [NO]) |