EP2651817 - SELENIUM RECOVERY FROM BIOREACTOR SLUDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company (a New York Corporation) 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Jie 19521 Beckworth Avenue Torrance, California 90503 / US | 02 /
FU, Qijia 13-501 500 Huamu road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Hong 718-3-1103 Huamu Road Pudong Shanghai 200000 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Yan 17-402 199 Baiyang Road Shanghai 201204 / CN | 05 /
XU, Weiqing 10-602 49 Bibo Road Pudong Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Jungang 76-101 580 Kanghong Road Pudong Shanghai 200000 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Yanping No. 10 399 Fuping Road Putuo District Shanghai 200333 / CN | 08 /
SHE, Minggang 2878 Gaoqing Road 66 62 Pudong Shanghai 200000 / CN | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Williams, Andrew Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10860878.7 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010CN02069 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012079201 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651817 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B19/02, C02F3/34, C01F11/18, C02F103/18, B01D53/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
C01B19/02 (EP,US);
C02F11/004 (US);
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
C02F11/06 (EP,US);
C02F11/127 (EP,US);
C02F2101/106 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
C02F2303/16 (EP,US);
C02F3/06 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/43] | C01B19/02, C02F3/34, C01F11/18, C02F103/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | SELENRÜCKGEWINNUNG AUS BIOREAKTORSCHLAMM | [2013/43] | English: | SELENIUM RECOVERY FROM BIOREACTOR SLUDGE | [2013/43] | French: | RÉCUPÉRATION DE SÉLÉNIUM À PARTIR DE BOUES DE BIORÉACTEUR | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2007012181 (ZENON TECHNOLOGY PARTNERSHIP [US], et al) [ID] 1-13 * claims 1,4,9-15 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] *; | [I]US4377486 (BARRICK PAUL E, et al) [I] 1-13 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 7 *; | [A]CA1337019 (CA MINISTER ENERGY [CA]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-3,7-9 *; | [A]US4519913 (BALDWIN ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,4,8-10,12 * | International search | [Y]US7550087 (PEETERS JEFFREY GERARD [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2009010922 (ALIMENT KFT DR [HU], et al); | [A]CA1337019 (CA MINISTER ENERGY [CA]); | [A]US6235204 (CASTALDI FRANK J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2007012181 |