EP2474986 - Transformer coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstr. 44 8050 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Benjamin Ennertstrassse 16 59955 Winterberg / DE | 02 /
Patel, Bhavesh Gernandstrasse 21 59929 Brilon / DE | 03 /
Esenlik, Burak Honoffstrasse 23 33102 Paderbon / DE | 04 /
Cornelius, Frank Eileringhauser Strasse 40 59936 Olsberg / DE | 05 /
Tepper, Jens Springstrasse 22 59929 Brilon / DE | 06 /
Zillmann, Karl-Heinz an der Diemel 4 34431 Marsberg / DE | 07 /
Bockholt, Marcos Sertüner Strasse 22 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000040.3 | 05.01.2011 | [2012/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474986 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H01F27/327 (EP,US);
H01F27/2895 (US);
H01F2027/328 (EP,US);
H01F27/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transformatorwicklung | [2012/28] | English: | Transformer coil | [2012/28] | French: | Enroulement de transformateur | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE287894 (AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT BROWN, BOVERI & CIE) [Y] 8,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]CH294051 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,15 * page 1, lines 30-67; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]CH350711 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-7,15 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 9; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8-11; | [X]EP0654803 (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,15 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 40 * * column 6, lines 25-43 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102006060567 (ABB AG [DE]) [Y] 9,12-14 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 24 - page 4, paragraph 30; figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [Y]DE102007053685 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 9-11 * abstract ** page 4, paragraphs 35-42; figures 1,2 * |