EP2365490 - Split spring anti-fretting fuel rod support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Cranberry Township, Pennsylvania 16066 / US | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company Llc 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Paul Marcus 219 Lake Hilton Drive Chapin South Carolina 29039 / US | 02 /
Broders, Richard P. 5 Old Field Road Granby Conneticut 06035 / US | 03 /
Marzean, Michael Anthony 7934 Burdell Drive Columbia South Carolina 29209 / US | 04 /
Winegardner, Michael 809 Beech Leaf Court Lexington South Carolina 29072 / US | 05 /
Reparaz, Adolfo 50 Gamers Spring Court Columbia South Carolina 29209 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/37] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000472.8 | 21.01.2011 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | US20100706166 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: US 706166 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2365490 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2365490 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365490 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/352, G21C3/356 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G21C3/352 (EP,US);
G21C3/30 (KR);
G21C3/33 (KR);
G21C3/356 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | G21C3/356, // G21C3/352 | ||
Former IPC [2011/37] | G21C3/352, G21C3/356 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | Kernbrennstababstützelement mit geteilter Feder zur reibungsverschleißfreien Halterung von Kernbrennstäben | [2011/37] | English: | Split spring anti-fretting fuel rod support structure | [2011/37] | French: | Dispositif de support de barreau de combustible anti-usure à ressort fractionné | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2011 | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | GB | 21.01.2015 | IE | 21.01.2015 | LU | 21.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE10002824 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 37 * * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 13 * * column 7, lines 41-48 * * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 15 * [A] 7 [I] 6,8-10; | [X]US2004196954 (STABEL-WEINHEIMER JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0101] - [0103] *; | [A]US2007223646 (MARZEAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0030] *; | [X]US2008232537 (REPARAZ ADOLFO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] * |