EP2361653 - Device for treating wounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovations-Transfer Uphoff GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Wegener-Strasse 6 35039 Marburg an der Lahn / DE | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nink-Grebe, Brigitte Glaubrechtstrasse 7 35392 Giessen / DE | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | von Bülow, Tam Rotbuchenstrasse 6 81547 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000516.2 | 22.01.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | DE20101008502 | 18.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008502 | [2011/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2361653 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2361653 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wundbehandlung | [2011/35] | English: | Device for treating wounds | [2011/35] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de plaies | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002065494 (LOCKWOOD JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0029] - [0044] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]WO2004037334 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,13 * page 36, line 31 - page 7, line 10 * * page 62, line 31 - page 68, line 16 * * figures 13-15, 27 * [Y] 9-12 [I] 4,5,7; | [Y]WO2006046060 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [Y] 11,12 * page 70, line 18 - page 71, line 17 ** figure 30 *; | [Y]WO2009003886 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [Y] 9,10 * page 6, lines 10-23 *; | [X]WO2009071932 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 6, lines 11-18 * * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 5 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US5636643 | US5645081 | US7216651 |