EP2360458 - Quick dynamic weighing machine and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hübler, Uwe Kleiststr. 11 15366 Neuenhagen / DE | 02 /
Kieser, Axel Berlepschstr. 102 14165 Berlin / DE | [2011/34] | Application number, filing date | 11000602.0 | 26.01.2011 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | DE20101009431 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010009431 | [2011/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2360458 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2360458 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/00, G01G19/414, G07B17/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G01G19/005 (EP,US);
G01G19/4148 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schnelle dynamische Waage und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer schnellen dynamischen Waage | [2011/34] | English: | Quick dynamic weighing machine and method for controlling the same | [2011/34] | French: | Balance rapide dynamique et procédé de commande d'une balance rapide dynamique | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 08.04.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3960227 (ZUCKER FREDRIC E, et al) [I] 1-13 * column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-5 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 2 * * column 9, line 11 - line 63 * * column 11, line 8 - column 12, line 21 * * figures 1-5 *; | [I]DE3731525 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 2 * * column 13, line 14 - line 61 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 44 * * column 18, line 5 - column 19, line 5 ** figures 1, 2, 7, 9-10A *; | [I]GB2235656 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [I] 1-13 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 10 * * figures 1-2 *; | [I]US2007050315 (RABINDRAN K G [US]) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] * | by applicant | EP0974819 | US2009008859 | EP2017589 | EP2065686 | US2009139777 |