EP2340928 - Embossed-in-register direct pressure laminate manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/27] | Embossed-in register manufacturing process | ||
[2017/43] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. SmartCity Malta SCM01 Office 406 Ricasoli Kalkara SCM 1001 / MT | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. SmartCity Malta SCM01 Office 406 Ricasoli Kalkara SCM 1001 / MT | ||
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. SmartCity Malta Building SCM01, Office 406 Ricasoli, Kalkara SCM 1001 / MT | ||
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Faus Group, Inc. 100 Marine Drive Calhoun, GA 30701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Eugenio Cruz Avenida d`Almansa 46700 Gandia / ES | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2018/15] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros 1 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/27] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11000615.2 | 12.07.2002 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | US20010903807 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: US 903807 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340928 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2340928 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2340928 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07, B44C5/04 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP);
B32B21/06 (US);
B32B21/02 (US);
B32B27/00 (US);
B32B27/04 (EP);
B32B38/08 (US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/0453 (EP,US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B44C5/0476 (EP,US);
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0076 (US);
B32B2317/122 (US);
B32B2317/125 (US);
Y10T156/1023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2011/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von DPL-Laminate mit dekorsynchroner Prägung | [2017/43] | English: | Embossed-in-register direct pressure laminate manufacturing process | [2017/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des stratifiés DPL avec un décor synchrone constitué de gaufrage et d'impression | [2017/43] |
Former [2011/27] | Geprägtes Registerherstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2011/27] | Embossed-in register manufacturing process | ||
Former [2011/27] | Procédé de fabrication d'enregistrement gaufré | Examination procedure | 26.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 04.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02752271.3 / EP1417091 | Divisional application(s) | EP17183202.5 / EP3263326 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020752271) is 26.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Xylo Technologies AG Rütihofstrasse 1 9052 Niederteufen / CH Opponent's representative Mader, Joachim Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/08] | 24.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2020 | 15.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.09.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.07.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2011 | 31.07.2015 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IE | 12.07.2018 | AT | 12.07.2020 | IT | 12.07.2020 | LU | 12.07.2020 | TR | 12.07.2020 | ES | 13.07.2020 | SE | 13.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | NL | 01.08.2020 | PT | 15.02.2021 | GB | 12.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | FR | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | DE | 01.02.2022 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/24] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
ES | 13.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
GB | 12.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
DE | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
ES | 13.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
GB | 12.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
DE | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
ES | 13.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
DE | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
ES | 13.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
AT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
SE | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/31] | CY | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1215971 (FORMICA CORP [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1262850 (FORMICA CORP [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US3814647 (MCQUADE J, et al) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 35 - column 3, line 70 * * column 5, line 37 - column 5, line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [X]AU519917B (FORMICA CORP) [X] 1-16 * page 20, line 14 - page 21, line 9; example 1 *; | [X]GB2088280 (FORMICA LTD) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 53 - page 2, line 102; examples 4,5 *; | [X]CH645301 (FORMICA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-16* examples 1,2 *; | [X]US5391340 (MIROUS GEORGE E [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9731775 | WO0196689 | by applicant | WO9731775 | WO0196689 | Opposition | GB1262850 | US3814647 | US4092199 | EP0020001 | GB2063178 | AU519917B | GB2088280 | CH645301 | CA1179590 | WO9731775 | WO9731776 | WO0148333 |