EP2353687 - Inspection chamber with filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavin B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | [2017/40] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Wavin B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roelfsema, Marcel Rollepaal 20 7701 BS Dedemsvaart / NL | 02 /
Van Dijk, Berend Jan Rollepaal 20 7701 BD Dedemsvaart / NL | 03 /
Huisjes, Alwin Rollepaal 20 7701 BS Dedemsvaart / NL | 04 /
Jager, Harm Jantinus Marcel Rollepaal 20 7701 BS Dedemsvaart / NL | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2011/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | de Vries, Janna Wavin T&I P.O. Box 110 7700 AC Dedemsvaart / NL | Application number, filing date | 11000813.3 | 02.02.2011 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | NL20101037680 | 03.02.2010 Original published format: NL 1037680 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353687 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2353687 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/00, E03F5/14 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B01D21/0042 (EP);
B01D21/0087 (EP);
E03F5/14 (EP);
B01D2221/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2011/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Inspektionskammer mit Filter | [2011/32] | English: | Inspection chamber with filter | [2011/32] | French: | Chambre d'inspection avec filtre | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17194057.0 / EP3290096 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | MT | 02.02.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | EE | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HR | 04.10.2017 | |
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2588863 (HOWARD MCCURDY) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XI]WO9604058 (INT FLUID SEPARATION PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,6,14 * figures 1,3,6,12,13,15, * [I] 5,7-13,15; | [X]GB2354466 (SOUTHERN WATER SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1* figure 8 * | Examination | FR2536672 | WO9217260 | WO9307946 | WO9501215 | EP0718019 | US5753115 | WO0004972 | US2004055950 |