Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2328022
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.07.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
29.07.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
22.07.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.07.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
19.07.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.07.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.11.2014 |
First examination report |
|
15.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
03.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|