Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7989124 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2011 | B2 | US2010261099 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71536807 | 08.03.2007 | US82090810 | 22.06.2010 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3118681 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP3118681 | 18.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07251015 | 12.03.2007 | EP11000880 | 12.03.2007 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2328025 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07251015 | 12.03.2007 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2328024 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07251015 | 12.03.2007 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2328023 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | B1 | EP2328023 | 01.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07251015 | 12.03.2007 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2328022 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B1 | EP2328022 | 01.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07251015 | 12.03.2007 | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103324024B | 21.10.2015 | B | CN103324024 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | CN200710136300 | 09.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103324027B | 09.03.2016 | B | CN103324027 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | CN200710136300 | 09.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7767367 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2010 | B2 | US2007212619 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070092679 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100947166B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2010 | B1 | KR20090077031 | 14.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4883278B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2012 | B2 | JP2007241060 | 20.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1832926 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | B1 | EP1832926 | 26.12.2007 | A3 | EP1832926 | 12.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101082768B | 03.12.2014 | B | CN101082768 | 05.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102385241B | 13.05.2015 | B | CN102385241 | 21.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI454836B | 01.10.2014 | B | TW200745737 | 16.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006065763 | 10.03.2006 | Type | Divisional application | EP3118681 | Type | Earlier application | EP1832926 |