EP2362077 - Combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OHG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laiminger, Stephan Strandbadstrasse 13 6322 Kirchbichl / AT | 02 /
Soman, Ravindra 402, Vinayaka Residency Site 3 and 7 Krishna Reddy Layout Near AECS Layout Bangalore 560037 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
Raman, Venkatesh 1006, Nandi Deepa Apartment Kamanahalli Main Road Off Bannerghatta Main Road Bangalore 560076 Karnataka / IN | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Gangl, Markus, et al Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 11001203.6 | 15.02.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | AT20100000093U | 22.02.2010 Original published format: AT 9310 U | AT20100000195U | 25.03.2010 Original published format: AT 19510 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2011/35] | AT20100000093U | 22.02.2010 | |
AT20100000195U | 25.03.2010 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2362077 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2362077 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/02, F02M21/04, F02B19/12 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
F02B19/10 (EP);
F02B19/12 (EP);
F02D19/023 (EP);
F02M21/047 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | F02B19/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [2011/35] | English: | Combustion engine | [2011/35] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3659564 (SUZUKI TOSHIO, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 74 - column 4, line 10 * [A] 3,4; | [Y]JPH08121256 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0024] , [0 25] *; | [Y]JPH05321671 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0015] *; | [A]DE10133190 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *; | [A]DE10356192 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * |