EP2365080 - MCP-1 binding nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/37] | Mcp-1 binding nucleic acids | ||
[2015/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOXXON Pharma AG Max-Dohrn-Strasse 8-10 10589 Berlin / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Noxxon Pharma AG Max-Dohrn-Strasse 8-10 10589 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Purschke, Werner Wriezener Strasse 30 13359 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Jarosch, Florian Düsterhauptstrasse 42 13469 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Eulberg, Dirk Neue Welt 14 10437 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Klussmann, Sven Thrasoltstrasse 1 10585 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Buchner, Klaus Assmannshauser Strasse 3 14197 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Maasch, Christian Liebfrauenweg 23 13509 Berlin / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/37] | 01 /
Purschke, Werner Wriezener Strasse 30 13359 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Jarosch, Florian Düsterhauptstrasse 42 13469 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Eulberg, Dirk Neue Welt 14 10437 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Klussmann, Sven Paulsborner Strasse 83 10709 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
Buchner, Klaus Assmannshauser Strasse 3 14197 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
Maasch, Christian Ernststrasse 27 13509 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/37] | Bohmann, Armin K. bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001720.9 | 14.02.2007 | [2011/37] | Priority number, date | EP20060002935 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06002935 | EP20060024202 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06024202 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365080 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365080 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/115, A61K31/7088 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/115 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1136 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12Q1/6813 (US);
G01N33/566 (US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/37] | Title | German: | MCP-1-bindende Nukleinsäuren | [2011/37] | English: | MCP-1 binding nucleic acids | [2015/46] | French: | Acides nucléiques à liaison MCP-1 | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/37] | Mcp-1 binding nucleic acids | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 14.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07722818.7 / EP1984501 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2007 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.02.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.02.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 14.02.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.02.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0038714 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP1386972 (NOXXON PHARMA AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO2005108431 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim 15 *; | [A] - RHODES ANDREW ET AL, "The generation and characterisation of antagonist RNA aptamers to MCP-1", FEBS LETTERS, (20011005), vol. 506, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 85 - 90, XP004308705 [A] 1-23 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)02895-2 | [A] - EULBERG DIRK ET AL, "Development of an automated in vitro selection protocol to obtain RNA-based aptamers: identification of a biostable substance P antagonist", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0305-1048, XP002441887 [A] 1-23 * page 5, column L, paragraph 2 - page 7, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gni044 | [T] - ANDERS H -J ET AL, "Spiegelmer NOX-E36 for the treatment of chronic inflammatory diseases: A new chemical entity that inhibits CCL2/MCP-1 signalling", NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCHIVES OF PHARMACOLOGY, & 48TH SPRING MEETING OF THE DEUTSCHE-GESELLSCHAFT-FUR EXPERIMENTELLE-UNG-KLINISCHE-PHARMAKOLOGIE-UND-; MAINZ, GERMANY; MARCH 13 -15, 2007, (200703), vol. 375, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0028-1298, page 53, XP009086368 [T] 1-28 * abstract * | by applicant | US6011020 | EP1306382 | WO2005074993 | - "Methods in Molecular Biology", M.J. DAMHA; K.K. OGILVIE, Protocols for oligonucleotides and analogs, HUMANA PRESS INC., (1993), vol. 20, pages 81 - 114 | - WINCOTT F. ET AL., "Synthesis, deprotection, analysis and purification of RNA and ribosomes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (19950725), vol. 23, no. 14, pages 2677 - 2684 | - DROLET ET AL., "Pharmacokinetics and Safety of an Anti-Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor Aptamer (NX1838) Following Injection into the Vitreous Humor of Rhesus Monkeys", PHARM RES, (2000), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1503 - 1510 | - AKAHOSHI T; WADA C; ENDO H; HIROTA K; HOSAKA S; TAKAGISHI K; KONDO H; KASHIWAZAKI S; MATSUSHIMA K, "Expression of monocyte chemotactic and activating factor in rheumatoid arthritis. Regulation of its production in synovial cells by interleukin- and tumor necrosis factor", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1993), vol. 36, page 762 | - ALAM R; YORK J; MOYARS M; STAFFORD S; GRANT JA; LEE J; FORSYTHE P; SIM T; IDA N, "Increased MCP-1, RANTES, and MIP-la in bronchoalveolar lavage fluid of allergic asthmatic patients", AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED, (1996), vol. 153, page 1398 | - ALTSCHUL S F; GISH W; MILLER W; MYERS E W; LIPMAN D J, "Basic local alignment search tool", J MOL BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, no. 3, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL S F; MADDEN T L; SCHAFFER A A; ZHANG J; ZHANG Z; MILLER W; LIPMAN D J, "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19970901), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402 | - AMANN B; TINZMANN R; ANGELKORT B, "ACE inhibitors improve diabetic nephropathy through suppression of renal MCP-1", DIABETES CARE, (2003), vol. 26, page 2421 | - ANDERS H J; VIELHAUER V; FRINK M; LINDE Y; COHEN C D; BLATTNER S M; KRETZLER M; STRUTZ F; MACK M; GRONE H J, "A chemokine receptor CCR-1 antagonist reduces renal fibrosis after unilateral ureter ligation", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2002), vol. 109, page 251 | - ANDERS H J; VIELHAUER V; SCHL6NDORFF D, "Chemokines and chemokine receptors are involved in the resolution or progression of renal disease", KIDNEY INT., (2003), vol. 63, page 401 | - AURUP H ET AL., "Oligonucleotide duplexes containing 2'-amino-2'-deoxycytidines: thermal stability and chemical reactivity", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (19940111), vol. 22, pages 20 - 24 | - AUSTIN H 3D; MUENZ L R; JOYCE K M; ANTONOVYCH T T; BALOW J E, "Diffuse proliferative lupus nephritis: identification of specific pathologic features affecting renal outcome", KIDNEY INT., (1984), vol. 25, page 689 | - BAGGIOLINI M; DEWALD B; MOSER B, "Interleukin-8 and related chemotactic cytokines - CXC and CC chemokines", ADV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 55, page 97 | - BAGGIOLINI M, "Chemokines and leukocyte traffic", NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, page 565 | - BANBA N; NAKAMURA T; MATSUMURA M; KURODA H; HATTORI Y; KASAI K, "Possible relationship of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 with diabetic nephropathy", KIDNEY INT., (2000), vol. 58, page 684 | - BANISOR I; LEIST TP; KALMAN B, "Involvement of p-chemokines in the development of inflammatory demyelination", J. NEUROINFLAMMATION, (2005), vol. 2, page 7 | - BAZAN JF; BACON KB; HARDIMAN G; WANG W; SOO K; ROSSI D; GREAVES DR; ZLOTNIK A; SCHALL TJ, "A new class of membrane-bound chemokine with a CX3C motif", NATURE, (1997), vol. 385, page 640 | - BERKHOUT T A, "Cloning, in Vitro Expression, and Functional Characterization of a Novel Human CC Chemokine of the Monocyte Chemotactic Protein (MCP) Family (MCP-4) That Binds and Signals through the CC Chemokine Receptor 2B", J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 16404 - 16413 | - BOHLE A; WEHRMANN M; BOGENSCHUTZ O; BATZ C; MULLER C A; MULLER G A, "The pathogenesis of chronic renal failure in diabetic nephropathy. Investigation of 488 cases of diabetic glomerulosclerosis", PATHOL. RES. PRACT., (1991), vol. 187, page 251 | - BORING L; GOSLING J; CHENSUE S W; KUNKEL S L; FARESE R V JR; BROXMEYER H E; CHARO I F, "Impaired monocyte migration and reduced type 1 (Thl) cytokine responses in C-C chemokine receptor 2 knockout mice", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, page 2552 | - BORING L; GOSLING J; CLEARY M; CHARO I F, "Decreased lesion formation in CCR2-/- mice reveals a role for chemokines in the initiation of atherosclerosis", NATURE, (1998), vol. 394, page 894 | - BORING L; GOSLING J; MONTECLARO F S; LUSIS A J; TSOU C L; CHARO I F, "Molecular cloning and functional expression of murine JE (monocyte chemoattractant protein 1) and murine macrophage inflammatory protein lalpha receptors: evidence for two closely linked C-C chemokine receptors on chromosome 9", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 7551 | - BOSSINK A W; PAEMEN L; JANSEN P M; HACK C E; THIJS L G; VAN DAMME J, "Plasma levels of the chemokines monocyte chemotactic proteins-1 and -2 are elevated in human sepsis", BLOOD, (1995), vol. 86, page 3841 | - BOWER G; BROWN D M; STEFFES M W; VERNIER R L; MAUER S M, "Studies of the glomerular mesangium and the juxtaglomerular apparatus in the genetically diabetic mouse", LAB. INVEST., (1980), vol. 43, page 333 | - CHARO I F; MYERS S J; HERMAN A; FRANCI C; CONNOLLY A J; COUGHLIN S R, "Molecular cloning and functional expression of two monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 receptors reveals alternative splicing of the carboxyl-terminal tails", PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 2752 | - CHOW F Y; NIKOLIC-PATERSON D J; MA F Y; OZOLS E; ROLLINS B J; TESCH G H, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1-induced tissue inflammation is critical for the development of renal injury but not type 2 diabetes in obese db/db mice", DIABETOLOGICA, (2007), vol. 5Q, page 471 | - CHOW F Y; NIKOLIC-PATERSON D J; OZOLS E; ATKINS R C; ROLLIN B J; TESCH G H, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 promotes the development of diabetic renal injury in streptozotocin- treated mice", KIDNEY INT., (2006), vol. 69, page 73 | - CHOW F; OZOLS E; NIKOLIC-PATERSON D J; ATKINS R C; TESCH G H, "Macrophages in mouse type 2 diabetic nephropathy: Correlation with diabetic state and progressive renal injury", KIDNEY INT., (2004), vol. 65, page 116 | - COCKWELL P; HOWIE A J; ADU D; SAVAGE C O, "In situ analysis of C-C chemokine mRNA in human glomerulonephritis", KIDNEY INT., (1998), vol. 54, page 827 | - COHEN C D; GRONE H J; GR6NE E F; NELSON P J; SCHLöNDORFF D; KRETZLER M, "Laser microdissection and gene expression analysis on formaldehyde-fixed archival tissue", KIDNEY INT., (2002), vol. 61, page 125 | - CUMMINS L L ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1995), vol. 23, pages 2019 - 2024 | - DALLA VESTRA M; MUSSAP M; GALLINA P; BRUSEGHIN M; CERNIGOI A M; SALLER A; PLEBANI M; FIORETTO P, "Acute-phase markers of inflammation and glomerular structure in patients with type 2 diabetes", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, no. 1, page 78 | - DAWSON J; MILTZ W; MIR A K; WIESSNER C, "Targeting monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 signalling in disease", EXPERT OPIN. THER. TARGETS, (2003), vol. 7, page 35 | - DE BLEECKER J L; DE PAEPE B; VANWALLEGHEM I E; SCHRODER J M, "Differential expression of chemokines in inflammatory myopathies", NEUROLOGY, (2002), vol. 58, page 1779 | - DROLET D W; NELSON J; TUCKER C E; ZACK P M; NIXON K; BOLIN R; JUDKINS M B; FARMER J A; WOLF J L; GILL S C, "Pharmacokinetics and safety of an anti-vascular endothelial growth factor aptamer (NX1838) following injection into the vitreous humor of rhesus monkeys", PHARM. RES., (2000), vol. 17, page 1503 | - EATON B E ET AL., "Let's get specific: the relationship between specificity and affinity", CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (199510), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 633 - 638 | - EATON B E; GOLD L; HICKE B J; JANJIC N; JUCKER F M; SEBOSTA D P; TARASOW T M; WILLIS M C; ZICHI D A, "Post-SELEX combinatorial optimization of aptamers", BIOORG MED CHEM, (199706), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 1087 - 1096 | - ECONOMOU E; TOUSOULIS D; KATINIOTI A; STEFANADIS C; TRIKAS A; PITSAVOS C; TENTOLOURIS C; TOUTOUZA MG; TOUTOUZAS P, "Chemokines in patients with ischaemic heart disease and the effect of coronary angioplasty", INT. J. CARDIOL., (2001), vol. 80, page 55 | - EGASHIRA K; ZHAO Q; KATAOKA C; OHTANI K; USUI M; CHARO IF; NISHIDA K; INOUE S; KATOH M; ICHIKI T, "Importance of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 pathway in neointimal hyperplasia after periarterial injury in mice and monkeys", CIRC. RES., (2002), vol. 90, page 1167 | - FUJINAKA H; YAMAMOTO T; TAKEYA M; FENG L; KAWASAKI K; YAOITA E; KONDO D; WILSON CB; UCHIYAMA M; KIHARA I, "Suppression of anti-glomerular basement membrane nephritis by administration of anti-monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 antibody in WKY rats", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (1997), vol. 8, page 1174 | - FURUICHI K; WADA T; IWATA Y; KITAGAWA K; KOBAYASHI K-I; HASHIMOTO H; ISHIWATA Y; TOMOSUGI N; MUKAIDA N; MATSUSHIMA K, "Gene therapy expressing amino-terminal truncated monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 prevents renal ischemia- reperfusion injury", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2003), vol. 14, page 1066 | - FURUTA T; SAITO T; OOTAKA T; SOMA J; OBARA K; ABE K; YOSHINAGA K, "The role of macrophages in diabetic glomerulosclerosis", AM. J. KIDNEY DIS., (1993), vol. 21, page 480 | - GALASSO J M; LIU Y; SZAFLARSKI J; WARREN J S; SILVERSTEIN F S, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 is a mediator of acute excitotoxic injury in neonatal rat brain", NEUROSCIENCE, (2000), vol. 101, page 737 | - GALKINA E; LEY K, "Leukocyte recruitment and vascular injury in diabetic nephropathy", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2006), vol. 17, pages 368 - 377 | - GAO J L; KUHNS D B; TIFFANY H L; MCDERMOTT D; LI X; FRANCKE U; MURPHY P M, "Structure and functional expression of the human macrophage inflammatory protein 1 alpha/RANTES receptor", J. FXP. MED, (1993), vol. 177, page 1421 | - GARCIA-ZEPEDA E A; COMBADIERE C; ROTHENBERG M E; SARAFI M N; LAVIGNE F; HAMID Q; MURPHY P M; LUSTER A D, "Human monocyte chemoattractant protein (MCP)-4 is a novel CC chemokine with activities on monocytes, eosinophils, and basophils induced in allergic and nonallergic inflammation that signals through the CC chemokine receptors (CCR)-2 and -3", J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, page 5613 | - GERARD C; ROLLINS, B J, "Chemokines and disease", NAT. IMMUNOL., vol. 6, page 1182 | - GONG X; GONG W; KUHNS D B; BEN-BARUCH A; HOWARD O M; WANG J M, "Monocyte chemotactic protein-2 (MCP-2) uses CCR1 and CCR2B as its functional receptors", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, page 11682 | - GONZALO J A; LLOYD C M; WEN D; ALBAR J P; WELLS T N C; PROUDFOOT A; MARTINEZ-A C; DORF M; BJERKE T; COYLE A J, "The coordinated action of CC chemokines in the lung orchestrates allergic inflammation and airway hyperresponsiveness", J. EXP. MED, (1998), vol. 188, page 157 | - GORDILLO GM; ONAT D; STOCKINGER M; ROY S; ATALAY M; BECK FM; SEN CK, "A key angiogenic role of moncyte chemoattractant protein-1 in hemangioendothelioma proliferation", AM. J. PHYSIOL. CELL PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 287, page C866 | - GREEN LS ET AL., "Nuclease-resistant nucleic acid ligands to vascular permeability factor/vascular endothelial growth factor", CHEM BIOL, (199510), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 683 - 696 | - HANDEL TM; DOMAILLE PJ, "Heteronuclear (1H, 13C, 15N) NMR assignments and solution structure of the monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) dimer", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, page 6569 | - HARIGAI M; HARA M; YOSHIMURA T; LEONARD EJ; INOUE K; KASHIWAZAKI S, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) in inflammatory joint diseases and its involvement in the cytokine network of rheumatoid synovium", CLIN. IMMUNOL. IMMUNOPATHOL., (1993), vol. 69, page 83 | - HASEGAWA H; KOHNO M; SASAKI M; INOUE A; ITO MR; TERADA M; HIESHIMA K; MARUYAMA H; MIYAZAKI J; YOSHIE O, "Antagonist of monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 ameliorates the initiation and progression of lupus nephritis and renal vasculitis in MRL/lpr mice", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2003), vol. 48, page 2555 | - HEATH H; QIN S ET AL., "Chemokine receptor usage by human eosinophils. The importance ` of CCR3 demonstrated using an antagonistic monoclonal antibody", J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 99, page 178 | - HOLDSWORTH SR; KITCHING AR; TIPPING PG, "Chemokines as therapeutic targets in renal disease", CURR. OPIN. NEPHROL. HYPERTENS, (2000), vol. 9, page 505 | - HOLGATE ST; BODEY KS; JANEZIC A; FREW AJ; KAPLAN AP; TERAN LM, "Release of RANTES, MIP-la, and MCP-1 into asthmatic airways following endobronchial allergen challenge", AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED, (1997), vol. 156, page 1377 | - HOSAKA S ET AL., "Expression of the chemokine superfamily in rheumatoid arthritis", CLIN & EXP IMMUNOL, (199409), vol. 97, no. 3, pages 451 - 457 | - HUANG DR; WANG J; KIVISAKK P; ROLLINS BJ; RANSOHOFF RM, "Absence of monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 in mice leads to decreased local macrophage recruitment and antigen- specific T helper cell type 1 immune response in experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", J. EXP. MED, (2001), vol. 193, page 713 | - HULKOWER K; BROSNAN CF; AQUINO DA; CAMMER W; KULSHRESTHA S; GUIDA MP; RAPOPORT DA; BERMAN JW, "Expression of CSF-1, c-fins, and MCP-1 in the central nervous system of rats with experimental allergic encephalomyelitis", J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, page 2525 | - HUMBERT M; YING S; CORRIGAN C; MENZ G; BARKANS J; PFISTER R; MENG Q; VAN DAMME J; OPDENAKKER G; DURHAM SR, "Bronchial mucosal expression of the genes encoding chemokines RANTES and MCP-3 in symptomatic atopic and nonatopic asthmatics: relationship to the eosinophil-active cytokines interleukin (IL)-5, granulocyte macrophage- colony-stimulating factor, and IL-3", AM J RESPIR CELL MOL BIOL, (1997), vol. 16, page 11 | - IHM CG; PARK JK; HONG SP; LEE TW; CHO BS; KIM MJ; CHA DR; HA H, "A high glucose concentration stimulates the expression of monocyte chemotactic peptide 1 in human mesangial cells", NEPHRON, (1998), vol. 79, page 33 | - IYONAGA K; TAKEYA M; SAITA N; SAKAMOTO O; YOSHIMURA T; ANDO M; TAKAHASHI K, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in idiopathic pulmonary fibrosis and other interstitial lung diseases", HUM. PATHOL., (1994), vol. 25, page 455 | - JOHRER K; ZELLE-RIESER C; PERATHONER A; MOSER P; HAGER M; RAMONER R; GANDER H; HOLTL L; BARTSCH G; GREIL R, "Up-regulation of functional chemokine receptor CCR3 in human renal cell carcinoma", CLIN CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 11, page 2459 | - JOLICOEUR C; LEMAY A; AKOUM A, "Comparative effect of danazol and a GnRH agonist on monocyte chemotactic protein-1 expression by endometriotic cells", AM. J REPROD IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 45, page 86 | - JOSE PJ; GRIFFITHS-JOHNSON DA; COLLINS PD; WALSH DT; MOQBEL R; TOTTY NF; TRUONG O; HSUAN JJ; WILLIAMS TJ, "Eotaxin: a potent eosinophil chemoattractant cytokine detected in a guinea pig model of allergic airways inflammation", J. EXP. MED, vol. 179, page 881 | - KABURAGI Y; SHIMADA Y; NAGAOKA T; HASEGAWA M; TAKEHARA K; SATO S, "Enhanced production of CC-chemokines (RANTES, MCP-1, MIP-la, MIP-1?, and eotaxin) in patients with atopic dermatitis", ARCH. DERMATOL. RES., (2001), vol. 293, page 350 | - KAWASAKI AM ET AL., "Uniformly modified 2'-deoxy-2'-fluoro-phosphorothioate oligonucleotides as nuclease-resistant antisense compounds with high affinity and specificity for RNA targets", J MED CHEM, (1993), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 831 - 841 | - KENNEDY KJ; STRIETER RM; KUNKEL SL; LUKACS NW; KARPUS WJ, "Acute and relapsing experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis are regulated by differential expression of the CC chemokines macrophage inflammatory protein-la and monocyte chemotactic protein-1", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 91, page 98 | - KIM JS; GAUTAM SC; CHOPP M; ZALOGA C; JONES ML; WARD PA; WELCH KM, "Expression of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 and macrophage inflammatory protein-1 after focal cerebral ischemia in the rat", J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 56, page 127 | - KITAMOTO S; EGASHIRA K, "Anti-monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 gene therapy for cardiovascular diseases", EXPERT REV. CARDIOVASC. THER., (2003), vol. 1, page 393 | - KLEINHANS M; TUN-KYI A; GILLIET M; KADIN ME; DUMMER R; BURG G; NESTLE FO, "Functional expression of the eotaxin receptor CCR3 in CD30+ cutaneous T-cell lymphoma", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, page 1487 | - KOCH AE; KUNKEL SL; HARLOW LA; JOHNSON B; EVANOFF HL; HAINES GK; BURDICK MD; POPE RM; STRIETER RM, "Enhanced production of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in rheumatoid arthritis", J CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 90, page 772 | - KOUNO J; NAGAI H; NAGAHATA T; ONDA M; YAMAGUCHI H; ADACHI K; TAKAHASHI H; TERAMOTO A; EMI M, "Up-regulation of CC chemokine, CCL3L1, and receptors, CCR3, CCR5 in human glioblastoma that promotes cell growth", JNEUROONCOL, (2004), vol. 70, page 301 | - KURIHARA T; WARR G; LOY J; BRAVO R, "Defects in macrophage recruitment and host defense in mice lacking the CCR2 chemokine receptor", J EXP. MED, (1997), vol. 186, page 1757 | - KUSSER W, J BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 74, pages 27 - 38 | - KUZIEL WA; MORGAN SJ; DAWSON TC; GRIFFIN S; SMITHIES O; LEY K; MAEDA N, "Severe reduction in leukocyte adhesion and monocyte extravasation in mice deficient in CC chemokine receptor 2", PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 12053 | - LESNIK EA ET AL., "Oligodeoxynucleotides containing 2'-O-modified adenosine: Synthesis and effects on stability of DNA:RNA duplexes", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 32, no. 30, pages 7832 - 7838 | - LLOYD CM; MINTO AW; DORF ME; PROUDFOOT A; WELLS TNC; SALANT DJ; GUTIERREZ-RAMOS JC, "RANTES and monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) play an important role in the inflammatory phase of crescentic nephritis, but only MCP-1 is involved in crescent formation and interstitial fibrosis", J. EXP. MED., (1997), vol. 185, page 1371 | - LU BB; RUTLEDGE BJ; GU L; FIORILLO J; LUKACS NW; KUNKEL SL; NORTH R; GERARD C; ROLLINS BJ, "Abnormalities in monocyte recruitment and cytokine expression in monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 deficient mice", J EXP. MED, (1998), vol. 187, page 601 | - LUBKOWSKI J; BUJACZ G; BOQUE L; DOMAILLE PJ; HANDEL TM; WLODAWER A, "The structure of MCP-1 in two crystal forms provides a rare example of variable quaternary interactions", NAT STRUCT BIOL, (1997), vol. 4, page 64 | - MACK M; CIHAK J; SIMONIS C; LUCKOW B; PROUDFOOT AE; PLACHY J; BRUHL H; FRINK M; ANDERS HJ; VIELHAUER V, "Expression and characterization of the chemokine receptors CCR2 and CCR5 in mice", J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, page 4697 | - MARTINELLI R; SABROE I; LAROSA G; WILLIAMS TJ; PEASE JE, "The CC chemokine eotaxin (CCL11) is a partial agonist of CC chemokine receptor 2b", J BIOL CHEM, vol. 276, page 42957 | - MATSUSHIMA K; MORISHITA K; YOSHIMURA T; LAVU S; KOBAYASHI Y; LEW W; APPELLA E; KUNG HF; LEONARD EJ; OPPENHEIM JJ, "Molecular cloning of a human monocyte-derived neutrophil chemotactic factor (MDNCF) and the induction of MDNCF mRNA by interleukin 1 and tumor necrosis factor", J. EXP. MED, (1989), vol. 167, page 1883 | - MCGINNIS S; MADDEN TL, "BLAST: at the core of a powerful and diverse set of sequence analysis tools", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, pages W20 - W25 | - MEYER TW, "Immunosuppression for diabetic glomerular disease?", KIDNEY INT., (2003), vol. 63, page 377 | - MILLER MD; KRANGEL MS, "Biology and biochemistry of the chemokines: a family of chemotactic and inflammatory cytokines", CRIT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 12, page 17 | - MILLER LE ET AL., JPHYSIOL, (1993), vol. 469, page 213 | - MORA C; NAVARRO JF, "The role of inflammation as a pathogenic factor in the development of renal disease in diabetes", CURR. DIAB. REP., (2005), vol. 5, page 399 | - MORII T; FUJITA H; NARITA T; SHIMOTOMAI T; FUJISHIMA H; YOSHIOKA N; IMAI H; KAKEI M; ITO S, "Association of monocyte chemoattractant protein- with renal tubular damage in diabetic nephropathy", J. DIABETES COMPLICATIONS, (2003), vol. 17, page 11 | - MURPHY PM; BAGGIOLINI M; CHARO IF; HEBERT CA; HORUK R; MATSUSHIMA K; MILLER LH; OPPENHEIM JJ; POWER CA, "International union of pharmacology. XXII. Nomenclature for chemokine receptors", PHARMACOL. REV., (2000), vol. 52, page 145 | - NAKAMURA H; WEISS ST; ISRAEL E; LUSTER AD; DRAZEN JM; LILLY CM, "Eotaxin and impaired lung function in asthma", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1999), vol. 160, page 1952 | - NAKAZAWA T; HISATOMI T; NAKAZAWA C; NODA K; MARUYAMA K; SHE H; MATSUBARA A; MIYAHARA S; NAKAO S; YIN Y, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 mediated retinal detachment-induced photoreceptor apoptosis", PROC NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, page 2425 | - NAVARRO JF; MORA C; MACA M; GARCA J, "Inflammatory parameters are independently associated with urinary albumin in type 2 diabetes mellitus", AM. J KIDNEY DIS., (2003), vol. 42, page 53 | - MYERS SJ; WONG LM; CHARO IF, "Signal transduction and ligand specificity of the human monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 receptor in transfected embryonic kidney cells", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, page 5786 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, "A general method applicable to the search for similarities in the amino acid sequence of two proteins", J MOL BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 443 - 453 | - NELKEN NA; COUGHLIN SR; GORDON D; WILCOX JN, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in human atheromatous plaques", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1991), vol. 88, page 1121 | - NEOTE K; DIGREGORIO D; MAK JY; HORUK R; SCHALL TJ, "Molecular cloning, functional expression, and signaling characteristics of a C-C chemokine receptor", CELL, (1993), vol. 72, page 415 | - NINICHUK V; GROSS O; REICHEL C; KHANDOGA A; PAWAR RD; CIUBAR R; SEGERER S; BELEMEZOVA E; RADOMSKA E; LUCKOW B, "Delayed chemokine receptor 1 blockade prolongs survival in collagen 4A3-deficient mice with Alport disease", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, page 977 | - OGATA H; TAKEYA M; YOSHIMURA T; TAKAGI K; TAKAHASHI K, "The role of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) in the pathogenesis of collagen-induced arthritis in rats", J. PATHOL., (1997), vol. 182, page 106 | - OKUNO T; ANDOH A; BAMBA S; ARAKI Y; FUJIYAMA Y; FUJIYAMA M; BAMBA T, "Interleukin-1 p and tumor necrosis factor-a induce chemokine and matrix metalloproteinase gene expression in human colonic subepithelial myofibroblasts", SCAND. J. GASTROENTEROL., (2002), vol. 37, page 317 | - OPPENHEIM JJ; ZACHARIAE CO; MUKAIDA N; MATSUSHIMA K, "Properties of the novel proinflammatory supergene "intercrine" cytokine family", ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, page 617 | - PAWAR RD; PATOLE PS; ZECHER D; SEGERER S; KRETZLER M; SCHLöNDORFF D; ANDERS HJ, "Toll- like receptor-7 modulates immune complex glomerulonephritis", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2006), vol. 17, page 141 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, "Improved tools for biological sequence comparison", PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - PEREZ DE LEMA G; MAIER H; FRANZ TJ; ESCRIBESE M; CHILLA MS; SEGERER S; CAMARASA N; SCHMID H; BANAS B; KALAYDJIEV S, "Chemokine receptor CCR2 deficiency reduces renal disease and prolongs survival in MRL/Ipr lupus-prone mice", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, page 3592 | - PEREZ DE LEMA G; MAIER H; NIETO E; VIELHAUER V; LUCKOW B; MAMPASO F; SCHLöNDORFF D, "Chemokine expression precedes inflammatory cell infiltration and chemokine receptor and cytokine expression during the initiation of murine lupus nephritis", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., vol. 12, page 1369 | - PONATH PD; QIN S; RINGLER DJ; CLARK-LEWIS I; WANG J; KASSAM N; SMITH H; SHI X; GONZALO JA; NEWMAN W, "Cloning of the human eosinophil chemoattractant, eotaxin. Expression, receptor binding, and functional properties suggest a mechanism for the selective recruitment of eosinophils", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1996), vol. 97, page 604 | - PONATH PD; QIN S; POST TW; WANG J; WU L; GERARD NP; NEWMAN W; GERARD C; MACKAY CR, "Molecular cloning and characterization of a human eotaxin receptor expressed selectively on eosinophils", J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, page 2437 | - POWER CA; MEYER A; NEMETH K; BACON KB; HOOGEWERF AJ; PROUDFOOT AE; WELLS TN, "Molecular cloning and functional expression of a novel CC chemokine receptor cDNA from a human basophilic cell line", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 19495 - 19500 | - QI Z; WHITT I; MEHTA A; JIN J; ZHAO M; HARRIS RC; FOGO AB; BREYER MD, "Serial determination of glomerular filtration rate in conscious mice using FITC-inulin clearance", AM. J. PHYSIOL. RENAL PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 286, page F590 | - QIN S; LAROSA G; CAMPBELL JJ; SMITH-HEATH H; KASSAM N; SHI X; ZENG L; BUTHCHER EC; MACKAY CR, "Expression of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 and interleukin-8 receptors on subsets of T cells: correlation with transendothelial chemotactic potential", EUR. J IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 26, page 640 | - RANSOHOFF RM ET AL., "Astrocyte expression of mRNA encoding cytokines IP-10 and JE/MCP-1 in experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", FASEB J, (199304), vol. 7, pages 592 - 600 | - RAPORT CJ; GOSLING J; SCHWEICKART VL; GRAY PW; CHARO IF, "Molecular cloning and functional characterization of a novel human CC chemokine receptor (CCR5) for RANTES, MIP-lp, and MIP-la", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 17161 | - RITZ E; RYCHLIK I; LOCATELLI F; HALIMI S, "End-stage renal failure in type 2 diabetes: A medical catastrophe of worldwide dimensions", AM. J. KIDNEY DIS., (1999), vol. 34, pages 795 - 808 | - ROLLINS BJ; STIER P; ERNST T; WONG GG, "The human homolog of the JE gene encodes a monocyte secretory protein", MOL. CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, page 4687 | - ROLLINS BJ, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein 1: a potential regulator of monocyte recruitment in inflammatory disease", MOL. MED TODAY, (1996), vol. 2, page 198 | - ROVIN BH; RUMANCIK M; TAN L; DICKERSON J, "Glomerular expression of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in experimental and human glomerulonephritis", LAB. INVEST., (1994), vol. 71, page 536 | - RUFFING N; SULLIVAN N ET AL., "CCR5 has an expanded ligand-binding repertoire and is the primary receptor used by MCP-2 on activated T cells", CELL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 189, page 160 | - SALCEDO R; PONCE ML; YOUNG HA; WASSERMAN K; WARD JM; KEINMAN HK; OPPENHEIM JJ; MURPHY WJ, "Human endothelial cells express CCR2 and respond to MCP-1: direct role of MCP-1 in angiogenesis and tumor progression", BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, page 34 | - SAMSON M; LABBE O; MOLLEREAU C; VASSART G; PARMENTIER M, "Molecular cloning and functional expression of a new human CC-chemokine receptor gene", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, page 3362 | - SCHALL TJ; BACON KB, "Chemokines, leukocyte trafficking, and inflammation", CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, page 865 | - SCHNEIDER A; PANZER U; ZAHNER G; WENZEL U; WOLF G; THAISS F; HELMCHEN U; STAHL RA, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 mediates collagen deposition in experimental glomerulonephritis by transforming growth factor-beta", KIDNEY INT., (1999), vol. 56, page 135 | - SCHWARTING A; PAUL K; TSCHIRNER S; MENKE J; HANSEN T; BRENNER W; KELLY VR; RELLE M; GALLE PR, "Interferon-beta: a therapeutic for autoimmune lupus in MRL-Faslpr mice", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, page 3264 | - SCHWARTZ CJ; VALENTE AJ; SPRAGUE EA, "A modem view of atherogenesis", AM. J. CARDIOL., (1993), vol. 71, page 9B | - SEGERER S; NELSON PJ; SCHLONDORFF D, "Chemokines, chemokine receptors, and renal disease: from basic science to pathophysiologic and therapeutic studies", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2000), vol. 11, page 152 | - SHIMIZU S; NAKASHIMA H; MASUTANI K; INOUE Y; MIYAKE K; AKAHOSHI M; TANAKA Y; EGASHIRA K; HIRAKATA H; OTSUKA T, "Anti-monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 gene therapy attenuates nephritis in MRL/lpr mice", RHEUMATOLOGY (OXFORD), (2004), vol. 43, page 1121 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, "Comparison of biosequences", ADV. APPL. MATH, (1981), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 482 - 489 | - SPRINGER TA, "Traffic signals on endothelium for lymphocyte recirculation and leukocyte emigration", ANNU. REV.PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 57, page 827 | - STEINMAN L, "Immune therapy for autoimmune diseases", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, page 212 | - SVENSSON M; SUNDKVIST G; ARNQVIST HJ; BJORK E; BLOHME G; BOLINDER J; HENRICSSON M; NYSTROM L; TORFFVIT O; WAEMBAUM I, "Signs of nephropathy may occur early in young adults with diabetes despite modem diabetes management: Results from the nationwide population-based Diabetes Incidence Study in Sweden (DISS)", DIABETES CARE, (2003), vol. 26, page 2903 | - TAKEBAYASHI K; MATSUMOTO S; ASO Y; INUKAI T, "Association between circulating monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 and urinary albumin excretion in nonobese Type 2 diabetic patients", J. DIABETES COMPLICATIONS, (2006), vol. 20, page 98 | - TAKEYA M; YOSHIMURA T; LEONARD EJ; TAKAHASHI K, "Detection of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in human atherosclerotic lesions by an anti-monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 monoclonal antibody", HUM. PATHOL., (1993), vol. 24, page 534 | - TANG WW; QI M; WARREN JS, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 mediates glomerular macrophage infiltration in anti-GBM Ab GN", KIDNEY INT., (1996), vol. 50, page 665 | - TASHIRO K; KOYANAGI I; SAITOH A; SHIMIZU A; SHIKE T; ISHIGURO C; KOIZUMI M; FUNABIKI K; HORIKOSHI S; SHIRATO I, "Urinary levels of monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) and interleukin-8 (IL-8), and renal injuries in patients with type 2 diabetic nephropathy", J. CLIN. LAB. ANAL., (2002), vol. 16, page 11 | - TESCH GH; MAIFERT S; SCHWARTING A; ROLLINS BJ; KELLEY VR, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein 1-dependent leukocytic infiltrates are responsible for autoimmune disease in MRL-Fas(lpr) mice", J. EXP. MED, (1999), vol. 190, page 1813 | - TUAILLON N; SHEN DE F; BERGER RB; LU B; ROLLINS BJ; CHAN CC, "MCP-1 expression in endotoxin-induced uveitis", INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2002), vol. 43, page 1493 | - TUTTLE KR, "Linking metabolism and immunology: diabetic nephropathy is an inflammatory disease", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, page 1537 | - UGUCCIONI M; MACKAY CR ET AL., "High expression of the chemokine receptor CCR3 in human blood basophils. Role in activation by eotaxin, MCP-4, and other chemokines", J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 100, page 1137 | - "Annual data report: Incidence and prevalence 2004", AM. J KIDNEY DIS., (2004), vol. 45, page 77 | - UTIMURA R; FUJIHARA CK; MATTAR AL; MALHEIROS DM; NORONHA IL; ZATZ R, "Mycophenolate mofetil prevents the development of glomerular injury in experimental diabetes", KIDNEY INT., (2003), vol. 63, page 209 | - VAN RIPER G; SICILIANO S; FISCHER PA; MEURER R; SPRINGER MS; ROSEN H, "Characterization and species distribution of high affinity GTP-coupled receptors for human rantes and monocyte chemoattractant protein 1", J. EXP. MED, (1993), vol. 177, page 851 | - VENKATESAN N ET AL., "NOVEL PHOSPHORMAIDITE BUILDING BLOCKS IN SYNTHESIS AND APPLICATIONS TOWARD MODIFIED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES", CURR MED CHEM, (2003), vol. 10, pages 1973 - 1991 | - VESTERGAARD C; JUST H; BAUMGARTNER NIELSEN J; THESTRUP-PEDERSEN K; DELEURAN M, "Expression of CCR2 on monocytes and macrophages in chronically inflamed skin in atopic dermatitis and psoriasis", ACTA DERM. VENEREOL., (2004), vol. 84, page 353 | - VIEDT C; ORTH SR, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 (MCP-1) in the kidney: does it more than simply attract monocytes?", NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT., (2002), vol. 17, page 2043 | - WADA T; FURUICHI K; SEGADA-TAKAEDA C; AHIMIZU M; SAKAI N; TAKEDA SI; TAKASAWA K; KIDA H; KOBAYASHI KI; MUKAIDA N, "MIP-la and MCP-1 contribute to crescents and interstitial lesions in human crescentic glomerulonephritis", KIDNEY INT., (1999), vol. 56, page 995 | - WADA T; YOKOYAMA H; MATSUSHIMA K; KOBAYASHI KI, "Chemokines in renal diseases", INT. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 1, page 637 | - WADA T; YOKOYAMA H; FURUICHI K; KOBAYASHI KI; HARADA K; NARUTO M; SU SB; AKIYAMA M; MUKAIDA N; MATSUSHIMA K, "Intervention of crescentic glomerulonephritis by antibodies to monocyte chemotactic and activating factor (MCAF/MCP-1)", FASEB J., (1996), vol. 10, page 1418 | - WANG X; YUE TL; BARONE FC; FEUERSTEIN GZ, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 messenger RNA expression in rat ischemic cortex", STROKE, (1995), vol. 26, page 661 | - WENZEL U; SCHNEIDER A; VALENTE AJ; ABBOUD HE; THAISS F; HELMCHEN UM; STAHL RA, "Monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 mediates monocyte/macrophage influx in anti-thymocyte antibody-induced glomerulonephritis", KIDNEY INT., (1997), vol. 51, page 770 | - YAMAGISHI S; INAGAKI Y; OKAMOTO T; AMANO S; KOGA K; TAKEUCHI M; MAKITA Z, "Advanced glycation end product-induced apoptosis and overexpression of vascular endothelial growth factor and monocyte chemoattractant protein-1 in human-cultured mesangial cells", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, page 20309 | - YING S; ROBINSON DS; MENG Q; ROTTMAN J; KENNEDY R; RINGLER DJ; MACKAY CR; DAUGHERTY BL; SPRINGER MS; DURHAM SR, "Enhanced expression of eotaxin and CCR3 mRNA and protein in atopic asthma. Association with airway hyperresponsiveness and predominant co-localization of eotaxin mRNA to bronchial epithelial and endothelial cells", EUR J IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 27, page 3507 | - YING S; MENG Q; ZEIBECOGLOU K; ROBINSON DS; MACFARLANE A; HUMBERT M; KAY AB, "Eosinophil chemotactic chemokines (eotaxin, eotaxin-2, RANTES, monocyte chemoattractant protein-3 (MCP-3), and MCP-4), and C-C chemokine receptor 3 expression in bronchial biopsies from atopic and nonatopic (Intrinsic) asthmatics", J LMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 163, page 6321 | - YLA-HERTTUALA S; LIPTON BA; ROSENFELD ME; SARKIOJA T; YOSHIMURA T; LEONARD EJ; WITZTUM JL; STEINBERG D, "Expression of monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 in macrophage-rich areas of human and rabbit atherosclerotic lesions", PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 5252 | - YOSHIMURA T; ROBINSON EA; TANAKA S; APPELLA E; LEONARD EJ, "Purification and amino acid analysis of two human monocyte chemoattractants produced by phytohemagglutinin- stimulated human blood mononuclear leukocytes", J IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 142, page 1956 | - YOZAI K; SHIKATA K; SASAKI M; TONE A; OHGA S; USUI H; OKADA S; WADA J; NAGASE R; OGAWA D, "Methotrexate prevents renal injury in experimental diabetic rats via anti-inflammatory actions", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2005), vol. 16, page 3326 | - ZIMMET P; ALBERTI KG; SHAW J, "Global and societal implications of the diabetes epidemic", NATURE, (2001), vol. 414, page 782 | WO2002EP11950 |