EP2367249 - Device for preventing a device mounting plate or other electro-installation device on a cable guidance channel from moving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | [2013/47] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szabo, Thomas Stettiner Str. 30 66849 Landstuhl / DE | 02 /
Wagner, Ralf Am Heiligenwäldchen 4 66649 Oberthal/Gronig / DE | 03 /
Schwarz, Jürgen Am Nabenberg 23 67705 Trippstadt / DE | 04 /
Arnold, Hans-Joachim Turnstr. 25 67706 Krickenbach / DE | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Ziegler, Stefan Michael, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Ziegler, Stefan Michael, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/38] | Patentanwälte Bitterich, Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001817.3 | 04.03.2011 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | DE20101011855 | 18.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010011855 | [2011/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2367249 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2367249 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367249 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H02G3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verschiebesicherung einer Geräteeinbaudose oder sonstigen Elektroinstallationseinrichtung an einem Leitungsführungskanal | [2011/38] | English: | Device for preventing a device mounting plate or other electro-installation device on a cable guidance channel from moving | [2011/38] | French: | Dispositif de sécurisation contre le déplacement d'un boîtier encastré pour appareils ou tout autre dispositif d'installation électrique sur un canal de guidage de conduite | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2011 | AL | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MK | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | RS | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | SM | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IE | 04.03.2014 | LU | 04.03.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MK | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 20.11.2013 | |
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 20.11.2013 | |
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10232102 (SPELSBERG GUENTHER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0237633 (SPELSBERG GUENTHER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1119087 | EP0733276 | DE9305750U | DE29722471U | DE10232102 |