EP2375090 - Method and device for mounting pre-tensioned roller bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital Technology Beteiligungs GmbH Kaltschmidstrasse 2-6 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seidel, Stefan Leechgasse 80/5 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Brandl, Christoph St. Stefanerstrasse 45b 8101 Gratkorn / AT | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Kovac, Werner Schwarzgrub 1 A-4755 Zell an der Pram / AT | [2011/41] | Application number, filing date | 11001878.5 | 07.03.2011 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | DE20101014217 | 08.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010014217 | [2011/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375090 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375090 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C25/06 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
F16C25/06 (EP);
F16C35/06 (EP);
F16C19/163 (EP);
F16C19/548 (EP);
F16C2229/00 (EP);
F16C2300/22 (EP);
F16C2326/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Montage vorgespannter Wälzlager | [2011/41] | English: | Method and device for mounting pre-tensioned roller bearings | [2011/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de montage de paliers à roulement prétendus | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 03.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2011 | AL | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | RS | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2011 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RS | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5125156 (WITTE DWIGHT C [US]) [Y] 7,10,12 * abstract * * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 3 ** figure 1 *; | [IAY]US2002124407 (ULLOM JON J [US]) [I] 1,3-6,8,9 * abstract * * claims 15,16 * * figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * [A] 11 [Y] 2,7,10,12; | [Y]US2005005451 (STRAIT SEAN [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0020] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1167794 |