EP2345380 - Cardiac valve procedure devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55342 / US | [2018/02] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohn, William, E. c/o Texas Heart Insitute 6770 Bertner Avenue Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 02 /
Lambrecht, Gregory, H. 220 Elliot Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | 03 /
Liddicoat, John, R. 2208 Oliver Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55405 / US | 04 /
Moore, Robert, Kevin 4 Rolling Lane Natick, MA 01760 / US | 05 /
Streeter, Richeard, B. 66 Brookside Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 06 /
Davenport, Todd, F. 48 Salem Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2018/02] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
Cohn, William, E. c/o Texas heart Insitute 6770 Bertner Avenue Houston, Texas 77030 / US | ||
02 /
Lambrecht, Gregory, H. 220 Elliot Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
03 /
Liddicoat, John, R. 2208 Oliver Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55405 / US | |||
04 /
Moore, Robert, Kevin 4 Rolling Lane Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
05 /
Streeter, Richeard, B. 66 Brookside Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
06 /
Davenport, Todd, F. 48 Salem Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
Cohn, William, E. 104 Lagrange Street Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | ||
02 /
Lambrecht, Gregory, H. 220 Elliot Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
03 /
Liddicoat, John, R. 2208 Oliver Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55405 / US | |||
04 /
Moore, Robert, Kevin 4 Rolling Lane Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
05 /
Streeter, Richeard, B. 66 Brookside Avenue Winchester, MA 01890 / US | |||
06 /
Davenport, Todd, F. 48 Salem Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2013/25] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11002111.0 | 13.11.2003 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | US20020425877P | 13.11.2002 Original published format: US 425877 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345380 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2345380 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345380 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01, A61F2/24, A61B17/12 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
A61F2/2427 (EP);
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61B17/1204 (EP);
A61B17/12109 (EP);
A61B17/12136 (EP);
A61F2002/018 (EP);
A61F2230/0006 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
A61F2230/008 (EP);
A61F2250/0059 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herzklappenverfahrensvorrichtungen | [2011/29] | English: | Cardiac valve procedure devices | [2011/29] | French: | Dispositifs de procédure de valvule cardiaque | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03789776.6 / EP1583581 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030789776) is 04.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2003 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9916382 (CARDEON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 35, line 25 - line 29 * * figure 51 *; | [A]WO0247539 (VIACOR INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, paragraph First * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002165576 (BOYLE CHRISTOPHER T [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] ** figures 5-8 * |