EP2506674 - An induction cooking hob with a pot detection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [2016/32] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeanneteau, Laurent 32, rue de Sablons 60200 Compiegne / FR | 02 /
Rigolle, Thibaut Viale Bologna 298 47121 Forli / IT | 03 /
Viroli, Alex Via G. Caletti, 22 47100 Forli / IT | 04 /
Christiansen, Svend Erik Via Masaccio 80 48018 Faenza / IT | 05 /
Martini, Filippo Via F. lli Cervi 7 48022 Lugo / IT | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Hausgeräte GmbH Group Patents 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/40] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Dienstleistungs GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11002525.1 | 26.03.2011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506674 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2506674 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | H05B6/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2012/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Induktionskochfeld mit einer Topferkennungsvorrichtung | [2012/40] | English: | An induction cooking hob with a pot detection device | [2012/40] | French: | Plaque de cuisson à induction avec un dispositif de détection de pot | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2011 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | GB | 26.03.2017 | IE | 26.03.2017 | LU | 26.03.2017 | MT | 26.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 26.03.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
MT | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.03.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
MT | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.03.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
MT | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
MT | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
MT | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 26.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 26.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR2863039 (BRANDT IND [FR]) [I] 1-11 * page 2, line 24 - line 32 * * page 4, line 18 - line 28 * * page 5, line 12 - line 24 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 16 * * page 15, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [I]WO2009053279 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 17 * * page 9, line 10 - line 23 * * figure 2 * | Examination | DE102010001002 |