12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
07.03.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
03.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
06.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
29.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
22.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
19.10.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |