EP2384823 - Air jet sieve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOSOKAWA ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Peter-Dörfler-Strasse 13-25 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Hans (Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Lohwaldstrasse 65 86356 Neusäss / DE | 02 /
Konetzka, Georg (Dipl.Ing. (grad) Hanns-Rupp-Weg 5 86199 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Schönwetter, Markus Dietrich-Bonhöffer-Strasse 5 86343 Königsbrunn / DE | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/45] | Application number, filing date | 11002770.3 | 02.04.2011 | [2011/45] | Priority number, date | DE20101015364 | 17.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015364 | [2011/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384823 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2384823 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B07B4/08, B07B11/04, G01N15/02 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B07B11/04 (EP,US);
B07B4/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/45] | Title | German: | Luftstrahlsieb | [2011/45] | English: | Air jet sieve | [2011/45] | French: | Tamiseur à courant d'air | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2011 | AL | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | ES | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | IT | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | MT | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | RS | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IE | 02.04.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | LU | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.04.2011 | |
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.04.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.04.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.04.2011 | |
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0654308 (RHEINISCHE WERKZEUG & MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1,9 *; | [A]DE19830050 (HOSOKAWA ALPINE AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10022391 (FOEDISCH UMWELTMESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2004174171 (DESIE GUIDO [BE], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0022]; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0654308 | DE10022391 |