EP2381208 - Method for determining positional data of a target object in a reference system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBDA Deutschland GmbH Hagenauer Forst 27 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states MBDA Deutschland GmbH Hagenauer Forst 27 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states LFK-Lenkflugkörpersysteme GmbH Hagenauer Forst 27 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holicki, Michael Belgradstrasse 74 80804 München / DE | 02 /
Zoz, Jürgen Sedanstrasse 24B 86316 Friedberg / DE | 03 /
Schweyer, Nikolaus Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 84 81739 München / DE | 04 /
Speth, Johannes Therese-Studer-Strasse 47 80797 München / DE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Avenhaus, Beate EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11002853.7 | 06.04.2011 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | DE20101018143 | 24.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010018143 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381208 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381208 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/02, F41G7/00, F41G7/22, G01S3/786, G06K9/32 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
F41G7/2226 (EP,US);
F41G3/02 (EP,US);
F41G7/007 (EP,US);
F41G7/2246 (EP,US);
F41G7/2253 (EP,US);
F41G7/2293 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | F41G7/22, G01S3/786, G01C21/00, G06K9/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Positionsdaten eines Zielobjekts in einem Referenzsystem | [2011/43] | English: | Method for determining positional data of a target object in a reference system | [2011/43] | French: | Procédé de détermination de données de position d'un objet cible dans un système de référence | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 14.06.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 11.07.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 23.10.2016 | Observations by third parties | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2011 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | AT | 06.04.2020 | IE | 06.04.2020 | LU | 06.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.04.2011 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
AT | 06.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
AT | 06.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
AT | 06.04.2020 | ||
IE | 06.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.04.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH675638 (CONTRAVES AG) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5881969 (MILLER BILLY KEITH [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XI]US2006120590 (HAN RUEY-YUAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0298] - paragraph [0306] * [I] 3,6,7,10; | [A]EP1983292 (LFK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XI] - CHRISTY S ET AL, "Terminal air-to-ground missile guidance by infrared seeker", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (19970423), no. 3086, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 233 - 243, XP002076459 [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 233 - page 234 * [I] 2-7,9,10 | Examination | US2006210169 | - WILDES R P ET AL, "Video georegistration: algorithm and quantitative evaluation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHT IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION. (ICCV). VANCOUVER, BRITISH COLUMBIA, CANADA, JULY 7 - 14, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20010707), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7695-1143-6, pages 343 - 350, XP010554109 |