EP2366542 - Edge trim for pieces of furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Helmut-Wagner-Straße 1 95111 Rehau / DE | For all designated states bulthaup GmbH & Co KG Werkstraße 6 84153 Aich (Bodenkirchen) / DE | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
For all designated states bulthaup GmbH & Co KG Werkstraße 6 84153 Aich (Bodenkirchen) / DE | |||
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Rehau AG & Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
For all designated states bulthaup GmbH & Co KG Werkstraße 6 84153 Aich (Bodenkirchen) / DE | |||
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Rehau AG & Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Uwe Geierlohweg 51 95111 Rehau / DE | 02 /
Glaser, Peter Vogtlandstrasse 18 95111 Rehau / DE | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11003102.8 | 06.06.2008 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | DE20072011911U | 24.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011911 U | [2011/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366542 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B27/08, A47B96/20, B29C63/00, C09J7/02, B32B27/32 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
A47B96/201 (EP,US);
B27D5/003 (EP,US);
B29C63/0026 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/1432 (EP,US);
B29C65/1483 (EP,US);
B29C65/1632 (EP,US);
B29C65/1683 (EP,US);
B29C65/3456 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/114 (EP,US);
B29C66/3032 (EP,US);
B29C66/30322 (EP,US);
B29C66/30326 (EP,US);
B29C66/472 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/73162 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/7487 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/103 (EP,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C65/1425 (EP,US);
B29C65/1454 (EP,US);
B29C65/1654 (EP,US);
B29C65/483 (EP,US);
B29C65/4865 (EP,US);
B29C66/022 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,US);
B29C66/72325 (EP,US);
B29C66/72326 (EP,US);
B29C66/72329 (EP,US);
B29K2311/14 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
B29K2709/02 (EP,US);
B29K2709/06 (EP,US);
B29K2709/08 (EP,US);
B29K2711/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/44 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2809 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2817 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31616 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31645 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31895 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2011/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kantenleiste für Möbelstücke | [2011/38] | English: | Edge trim for pieces of furniture | [2011/38] | French: | Baguette de bordure pour pièces de meuble | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2020 | Observations by third parties | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2023 | Observations by third parties | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08801452.7 / EP2180995 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 21.09.2011 | Stay of proceedings | [2011/46] | 21.09.2011 | Stay of proceedings | [2019/11] | 03.06.2019 | Resumption of proceedings | [2019/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD124170 (VEB LEUNA-WERKE, LEUNA, DL) [X] 1,4,6,8-12 * page 1, paragraph l - page 2, line 7; examples 1-3; claims 1-4,6,7 * * page 4, line 6 - line 10 *; | [X]EP0648801 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-12 * page 3, line 18 - line 49; examples I,II,III,IV; claims 12,1-4,6,8,10-14 *; | [X]EP0782917 (TAAL MANUFACTURERS OF PLYWOOD [IL]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * column 6, lines 11,12; figure 1; claims 1,7-11 * * column 4, line 35 - page 5, line 33 *; | [XDY]EP1163864 (BLUTHAUP GMBH & CO KG KUECHENS [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0018] , [0020] - [0024]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 3,7; | [Y]WO02068192 (TRESPAPHAN GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 3,7 * page 1, line 11 - line 14 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 30 *; | [A]WO2006050899 (REHAU AG & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 12 - line 23; claims 1,28,29,34,35 *; | [XP]EP1852242 (DOELLKEN & CO GMBH W [DE]) [XP] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1163864 | other | EP0872917 |