EP2378045 - Insulating glass panes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rottler und Rüdiger und Partner GmbH Mühlsteig 57 90579 Langenzenn / DE | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rottler, Roland Winterstr. 10a 90522 Oberasbach / DE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003120.0 | 13.04.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | DE20102005075U | 16.04.2010 Original published format: DE 202010005075 U | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2378045 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2378045 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/66, E06B3/667 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
E06B3/6604 (EP);
E06B3/6675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Isolierglasscheibe | [2011/42] | English: | Insulating glass panes | [2011/42] | French: | Disque en verre isolant | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0655544 (ERBSLOEH JULIUS & AUGUST [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2273309 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, lines 5-11 *; | [A]US5351459 (KASSL ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10050928 (REINEKE ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0025] - [0028] * | by applicant | DE102005056123 | DE19642669 |