EP2381149 - Method for determining an operating position of an open/closed valve and field device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samson Aktiengesellschaft Weismüllerstrasse 3 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiesbauer, Jörg, Dr. Auf der Bayerswiese 37 64859 Eppertshausen / DE | 02 /
Unland, Stefan Mainstraße 5 - 7 63065 Offenbach / DE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Nils T.F. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2011/43] | Schmid, Nils T.F. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003168.9 | 14.04.2011 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | DE20101015647 | 20.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015647 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2381149 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2381149 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381149 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, G05B23/02 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
F16K37/0091 (EP,US);
F15B19/005 (EP);
F15B15/2838 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
F15B2211/857 (EP);
F15B2211/8752 (EP);
F15B2211/8755 (EP);
F15B2211/8855 (EP);
F15B5/006 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2011/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bestimmen einer Betriebsposition eines Auf/Zu-Ventils und Feldgerät | [2011/43] | English: | Method for determining an operating position of an open/closed valve and field device | [2011/43] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'une position de fonctionnement d'une soupape tout ou rien et appareil de terrain | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17193078.7 / EP3287680 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2011 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | AT | 14.04.2018 | IE | 14.04.2018 | LU | 14.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 14.04.2018 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 14.04.2018 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 14.04.2018 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
AT | 14.04.2018 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4976144 (FITZGERALD WILLIAM V [US]) [X] 1,2,9-11 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 36; figures 2,4 * [I] 3,5-8,12-14; | [A]DE10303889 (BAR PNEUMATISCHE STEUERUNGSSYS [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0033] - [0041]; figures 1,2 *; | [XPI]DE102008062290 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [XP] 1,2,9,11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figures 1,2 * [I] 10 |