12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
17.04.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
09.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.11.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2013 |
First examination report |
|
19.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
04.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.03.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |