EP2377415 - Adapter for protective helmets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bullard GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 12 53424 Remagen / DE | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junker, Ulf Mainstrasse 9 63450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Römer, Stefan Wittstaig 15 72525 Münsingen / DE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Ludewig, Rita Patentanwältin Schulstraße 1 71159 Mötzingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Ludewig, Rita Fichtenweg 8/2 71159 Mötzingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003186.1 | 15.04.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | DE20101015581 | 19.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015581 | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2377415 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2377415 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377415 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/04 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A42B3/04 (EP,US);
A42B3/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Title | German: | Adapter für Schutzhelme | [2011/42] | English: | Adapter for protective helmets | [2011/42] | French: | Adaptateur pour casques de protection | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2011 | AL | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | RS | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.04.2011 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MK | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.04.2011 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4521831 (THAYER JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]DE29922890U (VOGEL MEINOLPH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * pages 1,2; figures 1,4,5,7,9-11 *; | [AD]EP0751720 (JAMIESON JIM [CA]) [AD] 1,6* figures 1,8; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006112735 (PACIFIC HELMETS NZ LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 8, lines 12-17; figures 1,3,47-9 *; | [A]US2007103891 (SCHOT ADRIAAN [FR]) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029]; figures 2,4 * | by applicant | EP0751720 | DE202005006121U | DE202005004936U |