EP2378496 - Emergency call device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degelsegger, Walter Desselbrunn 21 4693 Desselbrunn / AT | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/42] | Application number, filing date | 11003405.5 | 23.04.2011 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | AT20100000632 | 19.04.2010 Original published format: AT 6322010 | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2378496 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2378496 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/01 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G08B25/016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Notrufgerät | [2011/42] | English: | Emergency call device | [2011/42] | French: | Appareil d'appel d'urgence | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6377179 (FULTON JOHN G [US]); | [Y]WO03007288 (KEYLESS SYSTEMS LTD [IL]); | [A]US2005254229 (HAMADE ALI [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006127440 (GARD DOG LLC [US], et al); | [YD]US2007200716 (HAASE ANDREAS R [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008120917 (KANG EUI-SU [KR]) | by applicant | DE2910016 | US4884132 | US5258746 | US5574433 | EP0617869 | DE19726357 | EP0875875 | DE19836118 | DE29819117U | DE20307641U | DE10128728 | EP1277333 | WO2005098724 | DE102006001179 | US2007200716 |