EP2389055 - Device for fixing devices in electrical installation assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hager Electro GmbH & Co. KG Zum Gunterstal 66440 Blieskastel / DE | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dissel, Klaus Schneckenstraße 10a 66131 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Gros, Bernhard Rue Principale 33 57800 Betting / FR | 03 /
Müller, Michael Kirchstraße 24 66271 Kleinblittersdorf / DE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Laurent Laurent Nuss Conseil 12, rue Theophile Schuler 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Bernhardt, Reinold Dr.-Ing. W. Bernhardt, Dr. R. Bernhardt Dipl.-Phys Partnerschaft Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003677.9 | 05.05.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | DE20102007186U | 22.05.2010 Original published format: DE 202010007186 U | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389055 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2389055 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, G01R11/04, // H05K5/02 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
H05K5/0204 (EP);
A47F5/0823 (EP);
H02B1/043 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | H05K7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von Geräten in Einrichtungen der Elektroinstallation | [2011/47] | English: | Device for fixing devices in electrical installation assemblies | [2011/47] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'appareils dans des dispositifs d'installation électrique | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4351505 (WICKERSHAM EDWARD) [I] 1-11 * figure all *; | [I]NL7906887 (WONDER PILES) [I] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]CH646526 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2053119 (STURTEVANT GEORGE R) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB913002 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2010215355 (OLIEN MICHAEL A [US]) [XP] 1-5,8,9 * paragraph [0034] * |