EP2395108 - Method for measuring resistance or sensitivity to taxoid compouns based on GBP-1 levels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/50] | Method for measuring resistance or sensitivity to docetaxel | ||
[2015/05] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 55 Corporate Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2013/06] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grueneberg, Dorre 58 Oak Cliff Road Newtonville MA 02460 / US | 02 /
Huang, Xi 47 Lennon Road Arlington MA 02474 / US | 03 /
Natesan, Sridaran 118 Heritage Avenue Ashland MA 01721 / US | 04 /
August, Paul 13 Hollow Tree Road Boxford MA 01921 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwälte / Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Körner, Kathrin, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstraße 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003917.9 | 01.12.2005 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | US20040634298P | 08.12.2004 Original published format: US 634298 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395108 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/5308 (KR);
G01N33/574 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/6893 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Resistenz oder Sensitivität gegenüber taxoide Verbindungen unter Verwendung von GBP-1 | [2015/05] | English: | Method for measuring resistance or sensitivity to taxoid compouns based on GBP-1 levels | [2015/05] | French: | Procédé de mesure de la résistance ou sensibilité au substances taxoïde utilisant le GBP-1 | [2015/05] |
Former [2011/50] | Verfahren zur Messung der Resistenz oder Sensitivität gegenüber Docetaxel | ||
Former [2011/50] | Method for measuring resistance or sensitivity to docetaxel | ||
Former [2011/50] | Procédé de mesure de la résistance ou sensibilité au docétaxel | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 14.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05852717.7 / EP1831398 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050852717) is 12.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002051978 (ROTH FREDERICK P [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 41; table 4 * * paragraphs [0097] , [0237] - [0239] - [0279] *; | [A]DE10260264 (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [E]EP1661991 (UNIV NIHON [JP], et al) [E] 2,3,10-12* paragraphs [0038] - [0039]; claims 11,15 *; | [I] - ZHENFENG DUAN ET AL, "Description of paclitaxel resistance-associated genes in ovarian and breast cancer cell lines", CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (20041124), vol. 55, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00280-004-0878-y, ISSN 0344-5704, pages 277 - 285, XP055010640 [I] 1-14 * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-004-0878-y | [A] - SASSE A ET AL, "Coxsackie-and-adenovirus receptor mRNA expression in human heart failure.", THE JOURNAL OF GENE MEDICINE. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 5, no. 10, ISSN 1099-498X, pages 876 - 882, XP002384538 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jgm.411 | [A] - SAVLI H ET AL, "Quantification of the FLI1 gene expression by real-time quantitative RT-PCR", TURKISH JOURNAL OF MEDICAL SCIENCES 2003 TURKEY, (2003), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 1300-0144, pages 21 - 25, XP009067688 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - CHANG JENNY C ET AL, "Gene expression profiling for the prediction of therapeutic response to docetaxel in patients with breast cancer", THE LANCET, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20030802), vol. 362, no. 9381, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(03)14023-8, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 362 - 369, XP002585629 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)14023-8 | by applicant | US4313734 | US4373932 | US4703017 | EP0280559 | EP0281327 | WO8808534 | US4816567 | US4857453 | US5225539 | US5585089 | US5693762 | US5859205 | - HONG, ONCOLOGY, (2002), vol. 16, page 9 | - RINGEL, HORWITZ, JNATL CANCER INST, (1991), vol. 83, page 288 | - WANG ET AL., CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, page 2619 | - KATSUMATA, BR J CANCER, (2003), vol. 89, page S9 | - KOLFSCHOTEN ET AL., BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 63, page 733 | - ANAND ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 3, page 51 | - TANABE ET AL., INTJONCOL, (2003), vol. 22, page 875 | - LI ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, page 11352 | - LEE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, page 28253 | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1980), vol. 70, pages 419 - 439 | - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, (1985), vol. I-II | - MCMANUS, SHARP, NAT REV GENET, (2002), vol. 3, page 737 | - SIMMER ET AL., PLOS BIOL, (2003), vol. 1, page E12 | - LUM ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 2039 | - AZA-BLANC ET AL., MOL CELL, (2003), vol. 12, page 627 | - ZHOU ET AL., JCELL SCI, (2002), vol. 115, page 3547 | - SHIN ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 4, page 483 | - SUDO ET AL., CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, page 2502 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2002), vol. 1593, page 45 | - HAFNER ET AL., ARCH PATHOL LAB MED, (2003), vol. 127, page 1221 | - RODRIGUEZ ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 10, page 5785 | - CHANG ET AL., LANCET., (2003), vol. 362, page 340 | - ESPINA ET AL., JIMMUNOL METHODS, (2004), vol. 290, page 121 | - ULLMANN ET AL., JBIOMOL SCREEN, (2004), vol. 9, page 95 | - BADIEE ET AL., BMC BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 3, page 23 | - BONNER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, page 1481 | - FEND ET AL., AM J PATH, (1999), vol. 154, page 61 | - CHIRGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, page 5294 | - DULAC, CURR TOP DEV BIOL., (1998), vol. 36, page 245 | - WANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD. SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 9717 | - WU, WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC NATL A CAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - CHANG ET AL., LANCET, (2003), vol. 362, page 362 | - JACKSON ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 21, page 635 | - KUNG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1990), vol. 87, page 9553 | - LANNI, JACKS, MOL CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 18, page 1055 | - TAYLOR, MCKEON, CELL, (1997), vol. 89, page 727 | - MASUDA ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2003), vol. 163, page 1109 | - MICHEL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (2004), vol. 101, page 4459 | - ROH ET AL., CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 63, page 8079 | - MERALDI ET AL., CURR OPIN GENET DEV, (2004), vol. 14, page 29 | - KIM ET AL., INT J MOL MED, (2003), vol. 11, page 799 | - ANAND S, PENRHYN-LOWE S, VENKITARAMAN AR., "AURORA-A amplification overrides the mitotic spindle assembly checkpoint, inducing resistance to Taxol", CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 3, pages 51 - 62 | - AZA-BLANC P, COOPER CL, WAGNER K, BATALOV S, DEVERAUX QL, COOKE MP., "Identification of modulators of TRAIL-induced apoptosis via RNAi-based phenotypic screening", MOL CELL, (2003), vol. 12, pages 627 - 37 | - CHANG JC, WOOTEN EC, TSIMELZON A, HILSENBECK SG, GUTIERREZ MC, ELLEDGE R, MOHSIN S, OSBORNE CK, CHAMNESS GC, ALLRED DC, "Gene expression profiling for the prediction of therapeutic response to docetaxel in patients with breast cancer", LANCET., (2003), vol. 362, pages 362 - 9 | - HONG, WK, "The current status of docetaxel in solid tumors", ONCOLOGY, (2002), vol. 16, pages 9 - 15 | - JACKSON AL, BARTZ SR, SCHELTER J, KOBAYASHI SV, BURCHARD J, MAO M, LI B, CAVET G, LINSLEY PS, "Expression profiling reveals off-target gene regulation by RNAi", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 21, pages 635 - 7 | - KATSUMATA N., "Docetaxel: an alternative taxane in ovarian cancer", BR J CANCER., (2003), vol. 89, no. 3, pages S9 - S15 | - KIM R, TANABE K, UCHIDA Y, EMI M, TOGE T., "Effect of Bcl-2 antisense oligonucleotide on drug-sensitivity in association with apoptosis in undifferentiated thyroid carcinoma", INT J MOL MED., (2003), vol. 11, pages 799 - 804 | - KOLFSCHOTEN GM, HULSCHER TM, DUYNDAM MC, PINEDO HM, BOVEN E., "Variation in the kinetics of caspase-3 activation, Bcl-2 phosphorylation and apoptotic morphology in unselected human ovarian cancer cell lines as a response to docetaxel", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 63, pages 733 - 43 | - KUNG AL, SHERWOOD SW, SCHIMKE RT., "Cell line-specific differences in the control of cell cycle progression in the absence of mitosis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1990), vol. 87, pages 9553 - 7 | - LANNI JS, JACKS T., "Characterization of the p53-dependent postmitotic checkpoint following spindle disruption", MOL CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 1055 - 64 | - LEE LF, LI G, TEMPLETON DJ, TING JP, "Paclitaxel (Taxol)-induced gene expression and cell death are both mediated by the activation of c-Jun NH2-terminal kinase (JNK/SAPK", J BIOL CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 28253 - 60 | - LI Y, DOWBENKO D, LASKY LA., "AKT/PKB phosphorylation of p21Cip/WAFl enhances protein stability of p21Cip/WAF1 and promotes cell survival", J BIOL CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 11352 - 61 | - LUM L, YAO S, MOZER B, ROVESCALLI A, VON KESSLER D, NIRENBERG M, BEACHY PA., "Identification of Hedgehog pathway components by RNAi in Drosophila cultured cells", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, pages 2039 - 45 | - MASUDA A, MAENO K, NAKAGAWA T, SAITO H, TAKAHASHI T., "Association between mitotic spindle checkpoint impairment and susceptibility to the induction of apoptosis by anti- microtubule agents in human lung cancers", AM J PATHOL., (2003), vol. 163, pages 1109 - 16 | - MCMANUS MT, SHARP PA., "Gene silencing in mammals by small interfering RNAs", NAT REV GENET., (2002), vol. 3, pages 737 - 47 | - MERALDI P, HONDA R, NIGG EA, "Aurora kinases link chromosome segregation and cell division to cancer susceptibility", CURR OPIN GENET DEV., (2004), vol. 14, pages 29 - 36 | - MICHEL L, DIAZ-RODRIGUEZ E, NARAYAN G, HERNANDO E, MURTY VV, BENEZRA R., "Complete loss of the tumor suppressor MAD2 causes premature cyclin B degradation and mitotic failure in human somatic cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2004), vol. 101, pages 4459 - 64 | - OJIMA, I., GENEY, R., CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2004), vol. 4, pages 737 - 40 | - RINGEL I, HORWITZ SB., "Studies with RP 56976 (taxotere): a semisynthetic analogue of taxol", J NATL CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 288 - 91 | - ROH M, GARY B, SONG C, SAID-AL-NAIEF N, TOUSSON A, KRAFT A, ELTOUM IE, ABDULKADIR SA., "Overexpression of the oncogenic kinase Pim-1 leads to genomic instability", CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 8079 - 84 | - SHIN HJ, BAEK KH, JEON AH, PARK MT, LEE SJ, KANG CM, LEE HS, YOO SH, CHUNG DH, SUNG YC, "Dual roles of human BubRl, a mitotic checkpoint kinase, in the monitoring of chromosomal instability", CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 4, pages 483 - 97 | - SIMMER F, MOORMAN C, VAN DER LINDEN AM, KUIJK E, VAN DEN BERGHE PV, KAMATH R, FRASER AG, AHRINGER J, PLASTERK RH., "Genome-Wide RNAi of C. elegans Using the Hypersensitive rrf-3 Strain Reveals Novel Gene Functions", PLOS BIOL., (2003), vol. 1, page E12 | - SUDO T, NITTA M, SAYA H, UENO NT., "Dependence of paclitaxel sensitivity on a functional spindle assembly checkpoint", CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 2502 - 8 | - TANABE K, KIM R, INOUE H, EMI M, UCHIDA Y, TOGE T., "Antisense Bcl-2 and HER-2 oligonucleotide treatment of breast cancer cells enhances their sensitivity to anticancer drugs", INT J ONCOL., (2003), vol. 22, pages 875 - 81 | - TAYLOR SS, MCKEON F., "Kinetochore localization of murine Bubl is required for normal mitotic timing and checkpoint response to spindle damage", CELL, (1997), vol. 89, pages 727 - 35 | - WANG TH, WANG HS, SOONG YK, "Paclitaxel-induced cell death: where the cell cycle and apoptosis come together", CANCER, (2000), vol. 88, pages 2619 - 28 | - WANG Z, BHATTACHARYA N, MIXTER PF, WEI W, SEDIVY J, MAGNUSON NS., "Phosphorylation of the cell cycle inhibitor p21Cipl/W AF1 by Pim-1 kinase", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2002), vol. 1593, pages 45 - 55 | - ZHOU J, YAO J, JOSHI HC., "Attachment and tension in the spindle assembly checkpoint", J CELL SCI., (2002), vol. 115, pages 3547 - 55 |