EP2527992 - Generating content data for a video file [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson, Fredrik Dockgatan 7 21112 Malmö / SE | 02 /
Håff, Olle Norra Gimonäsvägan 54 90734 Umeå / SE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004251.2 | 23.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527992 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
G06F16/70 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (US);
G06F16/784 (EP,US);
G06V40/168 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erstellung von Inhaltsdaten für eine Videodatei | [2012/48] | English: | Generating content data for a video file | [2012/48] | French: | Génération de données de contenu pour fichier vidéo | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004095396 (STAVELY DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007052149 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,13* the whole document *; | [I] - MICHAEL A SMITH AND TAKEO KANADE, "Video Skimming for Quick Browsing based on Audio and Image Characterization", INTERNET CITATION, (19950730), URL: http://www.informedia.cs.cmu.edu/documents/cmu-cs-95-186.pdf, (20080225), XP002470969 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - LIENHART R ET AL, "VIDEO ABSTRACTING", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971201), vol. 40, no. 12, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 55 - 62, XP000765719 [I] 1,2,7-12 * the whole document * |