EP2527792 - Method for supporting a pilot when landing an aircraft in case of restricted visibility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmidt-Strasse 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münsterer, Thomas, Dr. Fünfkirchener Str. 30 88069 Tettnang / DE | 02 /
Kielhorn, Peter Hirschbachweg 10 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 03 /
Wegner, Matthias Holzhalde 13 88048 Firedrichshafen / DE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Meel, Thomas EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung, LAIP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004366.8 | 27.05.2011 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527792 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2527792 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00, G01S17/89, G01S7/22, G01S7/24, G01S7/51, // G01S13/94, G01S7/06 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
G01C23/005 (EP,US);
G01S7/22 (EP,US);
G01S7/24 (EP,US);
G01S7/51 (EP,US);
G05D1/0676 (EP);
G01S13/935 (EP,US);
G01S7/062 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | G01C23/00, G01S17/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Pilotenunterstützung für die Landung eines Luftfahrzeugs unter Sichtbehinderungen | [2012/48] | English: | Method for supporting a pilot when landing an aircraft in case of restricted visibility | [2012/48] | French: | Procédé d'assistance au pilote pour l'atterrissage d'un aéronef en cas de visibilité réduite | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 22.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2011 | AL | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | SM | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | IE | 27.05.2014 | LU | 27.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | RS | 27.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MK | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 27.05.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 27.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005015333 (SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-13* page 5, lines 16-24 *; | [XDY]EP1650534 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [XD] 13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * [Y] 1; | [Y]EP1972896 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0015] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029] - [0033] *; | [Y]WO2011012102 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,13 * page 3, lines 1-10 * * page 4, lines 5-10 * | Examination | WO2009081177 | by applicant | DE102004051625 | WO2009081177 |