EP2530390 - Heating system and method for heating a plurality of rooms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munch, Lars Trelle Ager 46 6580 Vamdrup / DK | 02 /
Soerensen, Bent Lysningen 6 7190 Billund / DK | 03 /
Gammeljord, Peter Hornemansvej 23 7100 Vejle / DK | 04 /
Misztal, Leszek Tyttebaervej 3 8220 Brabrand / DK | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004501.0 | 01.06.2011 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530390 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530390 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
F24D19/1015 (EP,US);
F24D19/1039 (EP,US);
F24H15/254 (EP,US);
F24H15/258 (EP,US);
F24H15/375 (EP,US);
F24H15/486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | Heizsystem und Verfahren zum Heizen einer Vielzahl von Räumen | [2012/49] | English: | Heating system and method for heating a plurality of rooms | [2012/49] | French: | Système de chauffage et procédé de chauffage de plusieurs pièces | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 26.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.2014
11.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Möhlenhoff GmbH Museumstrasse 54a 38229 Salzgitter / DE Opponent's representative Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.2014
23.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Möhlenhoff GmbH Museumstrasse 54a 38229 Salzgitter / DE Opponent's representative Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | 03.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2015 | 20.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.05.2016 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2011 | AL | 24.07.2013 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | IT | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MK | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | RS | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | SM | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | IE | 01.06.2014 | LU | 01.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | GB | 01.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MK | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2014 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 01.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
PT | 25.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2521696 (CODITHERM CIE DISTR THERMIQUE [FR]) [A] 8,10 * page 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002060251 (NEVE CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [A] 7 * page 2; figure 1 *; | [YDA]DE102008051275 (MOEHLENHOFF WAERMETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * * pages 3-4 * [A] 4,14; | [YD]WO2010095093 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-3,5-13,15 * abstract * * pages 3-8 *; | [YA]WO2010095092 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1,11-13,15 * pages 6-9; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,14; | [A]GB2468343 (BMCI LTD [GB]) [A] 9* page 5; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE102007043714 | DE102008051275 | WO2010095093 |