Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2402189 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | B1 | EP2402189 | 12.08.2015 | A3 | EP2402189 | 04.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010025595 | 30.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010025595 | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010025595 | 30.06.2010 |