EP2397084 - Reciprocating rotary arthroscopic surgical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cesarini, Peter, M. 12 Overlook Avenue Londonderry New Hampshire 03053 / US | 02 /
Drucker, Karen 27 Beechwood Avenue Danville New Hampshire 03053 / US | 03 /
Jezierski, Rafal 60 Harvest Street Boston Massachusetts 02125 / US | 04 /
Cassidy, Roger, R, Jr. 31 Hampstead Street Methuen Massachusetts 01844 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | ||
Former [2011/51] | Guy, Mark Robert Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park GB-Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11004648.9 | 25.10.2002 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | US20010983810 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: US 983810 | [2011/51] | Previously filed application, date | WO2002US34128 | 25.10.2002 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2397084 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2397084 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (US);
A61B17/320758 (US);
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2913 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Hin- und hergehendes, sich drehendes chirurgisches Instrument zur Arthroskopie | [2011/51] | English: | Reciprocating rotary arthroscopic surgical instrument | [2011/51] | French: | Instrument chirurgical arthroscopique rotatif alternatif | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02786505.4 / EP1446059 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020786505) is 30.07.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5490860 (MIDDLE GEORGE H [US], et al) [X] 2-7,9,14 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 5 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 12 * |