EP2398243 - Method for remote user control for stereoscopic display and device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sezan, M. Ibrahim c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | 02 /
Yuan, Chang c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | 03 /
Daly, Scott J. c/o Sharp Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Northwest Pacific Rim boulevard Camas Washington 98607 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Innere Wiener Straße 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004800.6 | 10.06.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | US20100816237 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: US 816237 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398243 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N13/144 (EP,US);
H04N13/332 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N2213/002 (EP,US);
H04N2213/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung von Fernbenutzern für stereoskopische Anzeige und Vorrichtung dafür | [2011/51] | English: | Method for remote user control for stereoscopic display and device thereof | [2011/51] | French: | Procédé de contrôle à distance d'utilisateur pour affichage stéréoscopique et dispositif associé | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |