EP2394801 - Knife [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTOR KG Heider Hof 60 42653 Solingen / DE | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrbach, Martin Kirchsteige 7 73575 Horn / DE | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Roche, Florian Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 D-42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004822.0 | 14.06.2011 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | DE20101023680 | 14.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010023680 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394801 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394801 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B26B5/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
B26B5/001 (EP,US);
B26B5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2011/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Messer | [2011/50] | English: | Knife | [2011/50] | French: | Couteau | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 10.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | MT | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IE | 14.06.2017 | LU | 14.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 01.03.2017 | |
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20210670U (ZENG MIN ZHENG [TW]) [X] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2003154606 (SAUNDERS CRAIG M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1982802 (ADCO IND A SUBSIDIARY OF DALLC [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19723279 | DE102008019441 |