EP2452891 - Complementary personal lubricant compositions and delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2014/36] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road 08558 Skillman / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Nawaz 26 Joseph Court 08852 Monmouth Junction / US | 02 /
Cui, Cheng-Ji 3 Kentsdale Drive 08534 Pennington / US | 03 /
Ison, Bryant 15 Pine Knoll Drive 08648 Lawrenceville / US | 04 /
Huntington, Elysha 335 West 19th Street, B11 10011 New York / US | 05 /
Yumul, Anthony Corwin 504 Grande Apt. A H25 10002 New York / US | 06 /
Jeppesen, Jeffrey Lawrence 210 Clinton Avenue, 3C 11205 Brooklyn / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2014/36] |
Former [2012/20] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005243.8 | 08.02.2008 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | US20070889062P | 09.02.2007 Original published format: US 889062 P | US20070842271 | 21.08.2007 Original published format: US 842271 | US20070842487 | 21.08.2007 Original published format: US 842487 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2452891 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2452891 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/047, A61K31/16, A61K31/167, A61K31/235, A61K31/245, A61K31/445, A61K31/455, A61K45/06, A61K36/63, A61K36/61, A61K36/81, A61K36/906, B65D81/32 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
B65D81/32 (KR);
A61F5/41 (KR);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/245 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K36/61 (EP,US);
A61K36/63 (EP,US);
A61K36/81 (EP,US);
A61K36/906 (EP,US);
A61K36/9068 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/235, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/245, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/61, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/63, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/81, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2012/20] | B65D81/32, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | Komplementäre Gleitmittelzusammensetzung und Ausgabesystem | [2012/20] | English: | Complementary personal lubricant compositions and delivery system | [2012/20] | French: | Compositions lubrifiantes personnelles complémentaires et système de distribution | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 05.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.12.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 21.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08729411.2 / EP2121479 | Divisional application(s) | EP14189532.6 / EP2842551 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 22.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2012 | 28.02.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1049791 ; | [A]CN1053551 ; | [A]CN1049454 ; | [A]US4310488 (RAHM JUERG, et al) [A] 8,11 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5208031 (KELLY PATRICK D [US]) [A] 15-35 * column 20 - column 21; examples 1-3 *; | [X]US5316398 (CHANDARIA KAPOOR [UG], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 13 - line 31; figure 5 *; | [XA]EP0644129 (MAPLAST SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * column 1, line 3 - line 15; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 10; | [A]US6039951 (BJELDBAK GITTE [DK]) [A] 15-35 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0245573 (ARMKEL LLC [US]) [X] 35 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2002187165 (HARBECK MARIE HELENA [US]) [X] 35 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 57 * * page 4, paragraph 133 * * claims 1-21 * [I] 15-34; | [XI]US6581775 (HAGOPIAN GARO [US]) [X] 15-19,21-23,25,27,29,31,34,35 * the whole document * [I] 20,24,26,28,30,32,33; | [A]US2005042248 (AHMAD NAWAZ [US], et al) [A] 15-35 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005244520 (THOMPSON RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 15-35 * the whole document *; | [X]US7166137 (NARASIMHAN SAROJA [US], et al) [X] 35 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 4 * * column 24 - column 25; examples 3,4 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Cambridge Chemistry Set", online filing, (20070124), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070124212213/http://www.otherlandtoys.co.uk/cambridge-chemistry-set-p-1759.html, (20080604), XP002482987 [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,13,14 * "Cambridge Chemistry Set Features"; figures * | [XI] - "Female condom becomes available nationwide.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199501), Database accession no. NLM12288570, XP002679461 [X] 15-19,21,23,25,27,29,31,34,35 * abstract * [I] 20,22,24,26,28,30,32,33 | [ ] - ANONYMOUS, "Female condom becomes available nationwide.", CONTRACEPTION REPORT, (199501), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 11 - 14 | [XI] - SMITH ANTHONY M A ET AL, "Does additional lubrication affect condom slippage and breakage?", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF STD AND AIDS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE SERVICES, LONDON, GB, (19980601), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1258/0956462981922359, ISSN 0956-4624, pages 330 - 335, XP008153277 [X] 15-19,21,23,25,27,29,31,34,35 * abstract * * page 332, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 332, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 333; table 2 * [I] 20,22,24,26,28,30,32,33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1258/0956462981922359 | [X] - YANG R; ZHANG W; ZHANG Z, "Sanitary paper towel sprayed with three liq. medicines - for use before and after sexual intercourse to prevent diseases of male and female genitalia", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 46, Database accession no. 1991-333156, XP002679462 & CN1049791 A 19910313 ((ASIA-N) ASIA MED PLASTIC CE) [X] 35 * the whole document * | [A] - GU J, "Lubricant improving sexual life of aged women - protects vagina epithelial tissue from injury during sexual intercourse", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 19, Database accession no. 1992-151429, XP002679463 & CN1053551 A 19910807 ((GUJJ-I) GU J) [A] 15-35 * the whole document * | [A] - HE C, "Lubricant for application to glans penis - made from dried toad venom and Chinese plants and used for treatment of premature ejaculation", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 44, Database accession no. 1991-318141, XP002679464 & CN1049454 A 19910227 ((HECC-I) HE CUNCHENG) [A] 15-35 * the whole document * | [XP] - McNeil-PPC, Inc, "K-Y Yours+Mine Couples Lubricants", online filing, (2007), URL: http://milo.com/k-y-yours-plus-mine-couples-lubricants, (20120706), XP002679465 [XP] 15-19,21-23,25-27,29,31,33-35 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH02311408 | ES2074030 | US5885591 | US6641825 | US7005408 | US20030390511 | US20030389871 | US20030696939 | US20030697353 | US20030697838 | US20040847082 | US20040847083 |