EP2402773 - Power supply device capable of detecting disconnection of ground line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Masahiko c/o Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd. 5-5 Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Masato c/o Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd. 5-5 Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Hertz, Oliver v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005307.1 | 29.06.2011 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | JP20100150565 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010150565 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402773 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
B60L3/0069 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/60 (KR);
B60L53/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/14 (KR);
B60L58/15 (KR);
G01R31/382 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R31/54 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2270/145 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2200/92 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsgerät, das eine Unterbrechung der Erdungsleitung erfassen kann | [2012/01] | English: | Power supply device capable of detecting disconnection of ground line | [2012/01] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation capable de détecter la déconnexion d'une ligne au sol | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2008034296 | JP2008086069 |