Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
[2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 25.01.2012 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2186336 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 25.01.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 7/173 20110101AFI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/233 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/2343 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/2385 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/2387 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/258 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/2668 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/472 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/6543 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 21/6587 20110101ALI20120214BHEP | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 31.10.2012 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120921 | | Event date: | 13.03.2013 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20130215 | | Event date: | 29.01.2014 | | Event description: | APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | Effective DATE: | 20130827 | | Event date: | 17.02.2012 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 25.01.2012 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 27.12.2013 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | |