EP2546667 - Method for characterizing large area thin film photovoltaic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Randhahn, Jean Grofstrasse 7 8892 Berschis / CH | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/03] | Application number, filing date | 11005718.9 | 13.07.2011 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2546667 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/26, G01R31/40 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
H02S50/10 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methode zur Charakterisierung von grossflächigen photovoltaischen Dünnschichtzellen | [2013/03] | English: | Method for characterizing large area thin film photovoltaic devices | [2013/03] | French: | Procédé de caractérisation de dispositifs photovoltaïques à couche mince de grande surface | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011066439 (TRUSTEES BOSTON COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 2,4,5A,5B,7-9 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 17 * * page 6, line 24 - line 28 * * page 13, line 4 - line 22 * * page 18, line 23 - page 23, line 12 *; | [X]US6154034 (LOVELADY JAMES N [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 18 - line 30 * * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 3 *; | [X]EP0304145 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2B,3B,4B,5B,6B,7B,8B,9B * * page 7, line 40 - page 8, line 10 * * page 10, line 33 - page 12, line 4 *; | [X]US7733111 (ZHAO GUOHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 2-18 * * column 1, line 10 - line 26 * * column 4, line 30 - column 7, line 2 * * claims 1,5 *; | [A]WO2010034434 (STRAMA MPS MASCHB GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 37 * * page 6, line 9 - line 24 * * page 11, line 19 - line 34 *; | [A]JP2004247325 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-8 * * abstract * * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]EP1686386 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * | [X] - ZHAO H ET AL, "Vapor chloride treatment studies of CdTe/CdS solar cells", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 2002 INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS INC. US; [IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE],, (20020519), vol. CONF. 29, doi:10.1109/PVSC.2002.1190653, ISBN 978-0-7803-7471-3, pages 668 - 671, XP010666336 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2002.1190653 | [X] - INGUANTA R ET AL, "An electrochemical route towards the fabrication of nanostructured semiconductor solar cells", POWER ELECTRONICS ELECTRICAL DRIVES AUTOMATION AND MOTION (SPEEDAM), 2010 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100614), ISBN 978-1-4244-4986-6, pages 1166 - 1171, XP031727752 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |