|
04.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Cancellation of communication under Rule 112(1) EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn(copy of search results missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.09.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |