Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8529822 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2012020111 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW99123834 | 20.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2410239 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B1 | EP2410239 | 07.10.2015 | A3 | EP2410239 | 25.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | TW99123834 | 20.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI520839B | 11.02.2016 | B | TW201204542 | 01.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | TW99123834 | 20.07.2010 |