EP2423169 - Installation comprising reverse osmosis and softener for producing ultrapure water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | Installation comprising reverse osmosis and softener for producing ultrapure water | ||
[2014/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Völker, Manfred Meisenweg 1 63825 Blankenbach / DE | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstraße 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2012/09] | Flosdorff, Jürgen Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005886.4 | 19.07.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | DE20101048616 | 15.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010048616 | DE20101035680 | 27.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035680 | [2012/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423169 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423169 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, // C02F1/00, C02F1/44, C02F1/38, C02F1/48, C02F1/461, C02F1/36, C02F1/46, C02F1/467, C02F103/04, C02F103/02 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F1/36 (EP,US);
C02F1/385 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/4602 (EP,US);
C02F1/4672 (EP,US);
C02F1/48 (EP,US);
C02F1/481 (EP,US);
C02F1/484 (EP,US);
C02F1/485 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46133 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46152 (EP,US);
C02F2103/026 (EP,US);
C02F2103/04 (EP,US);
C02F2201/003 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46175 (EP,US);
C02F2209/008 (EP,US);
C02F2209/04 (EP,US);
C02F2209/11 (EP,US);
C02F2301/026 (EP,US);
C02F2301/046 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US);
C02F2303/10 (EP,US);
C02F2303/16 (EP,US);
C02F2303/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/09] | C02F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Reinstwasser mit Umkehrosmose und Enthärter | [2014/32] | English: | Installation comprising reverse osmosis and softener for producing ultrapure water | [2014/32] | French: | Installation comprenant des unités d'osmose inversé et adoucisseur pour produire de i'eau ultrapure | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/09] | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Reinstwasser mit Umkehrosmose und Enthärter | ||
Former [2012/09] | Installation comprising reverse osmosis and softener for producing ultrapure water | ||
Former [2012/09] | Installation comprenent des unités d'osmose inversé et adoucisseur pour produire de i'eau ultrapure | Examination procedure | 18.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.07.2014 | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14003593.2 / EP2835358 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2011 | AL | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | RS | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | GB | 19.07.2015 | IE | 19.07.2015 | LU | 19.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MK | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008164209 (ZACERKOWNY OREST [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040]; figures 1-6; claims 1-48 *; | [X]EP1431250 (BARNSTEAD THERMOLYNE CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2004055955 (DAVIS THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,5-7 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0123] * | Examination | WO9717297 |