EP2418572 - Mobile terminal and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honh, Jiyoung LG ELECTRONICS INC. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 02 /
Sekhar, Penugonda Chandra LG ELECTRONICS INC. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstraße 45 DE-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstraße 45 DE-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11006437.5 | 04.08.2011 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | KR20100077926 | 12.08.2010 Original published format: KR 20100077926 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2418572 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2418572 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, H04M1/00 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2012/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Ansteuerungsverfahren dafür | [2012/07] | English: | Mobile terminal and method of controlling the same | [2012/07] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé de commande | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5461710 (BLOOMFIELD MARC A [US], et al) [A] 4-9,12-15 * abstract ** column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 19; figures 5-9 *; | [I]US2005289476 (TOKKONEN TIMO [FI]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2-3C * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figures 5A-5C *; | [A]EP1760572 (SAP AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figure 4 *; | [I]EP2045705 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0105]; figures 6, 7, 9-11 *; | [A] - DAN FRAKES, "Hands on with iOS 4 folders", INTERNET CITATION, (20100621), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.macworld.com/article/1152168/ios4folders.html, (20140627), XP002726352 [A] 4-9,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR20100077926 |