|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
15.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |