01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
10.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
02.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
27.07.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.06.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change - inventor |
|
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
06.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.07.2016 |
First examination report |
|
20.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
28.08.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.01.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
25.01.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |