03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
08.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
04.05.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
26.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
25.01.2013 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
09.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.12.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
03.12.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.11.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
05.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
24.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|